Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-06331

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Helen E Burris
Case #: 7:16-ap-80005
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2016
Terminated:Mar 04, 2016

Debtor
Mollie C Jones
409 Center Street
Greer, SC 29651
Represented By
Mollie C Jones
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
TD Bank USA NA
Gregory Preston Cowan 1315 Westbrook Plaza Dr
Winston Salem, NC 27103
Represented By
TD Bank USA NA
contact info
Trustee
Randy A. Skinner
300 N. Main Street Suite 201A
Greenville, SC 29601


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, March 04, 2016
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/04 9:18 AM
Adversary Case Closed. (Lee, D)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 03/04 9:18 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 16-80005 Default Judgment Complaint. (Lee, D)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 20, 2016
11 11 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sun 02/21 12:44 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 02/20/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sun 02/21 12:44 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 02/20/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, February 18, 2016
9 9 court Entry on Judgment Index Thu 02/18 9:54 AM
Entry in Judgment Index relating to: Default Judgment against TD Bank USA NA Document Served. Related [+] (Lee, D)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 order Default Judgment Thu 02/18 9:52 AM
Default Judgment against TD Bank USA NA Document Served. (Lee, D)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Clerks Entry of Default Thu 02/18 8:50 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to TD Bank USA NA Related [+]. (Lee, D)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
6 6 misc Proposed Order Wed 02/17 5:49 PM
Proposed Order RE: Affidavit of Default and Request for Default Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by Mollie C Jones. Filed by Mollie C Jones Related [+]. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Affidavit of Default Wed 02/17 5:29 PM
Affidavit of Default and Request for Default Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by Mollie C Jones. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 11, 2016
4 4 order Order (generic) Thu 02/11 3:14 PM
Default Request Order, Re: Complaint filed by Debtor Mollie C Jones, Plaintiff Mollie C Jones. Plaintiff Shall submit for filing within seven days an affidavit of default and proposed order for judgment or a settlement order. Failure to comply shall result in an order dismissing without prejudice. Document Served . Related [+]. (Richardson, R)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/12 7:05 PM
Certificate of Service related to Complaint, Summons Issued Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Mollie C Jones. Related [+]. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Thursday, January 07, 2016
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Thu 01/07 12:04 PM
Summons Issued on TD Bank USA NA Answer Due 2/8/2016 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Lee, D)
Related: [-]
court Add Judge Thu 01/07 7:56 AM
Judge Helen E. Burris added to case (Lee, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/06 5:47 PM
Adversary case 16-80005 Complaint by Mollie C Jones against TD Bank USA NA c/o Gregory Preston Cowan Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00 No Fee. (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]