Hatcher v. Cleveland Clinic Foundation et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher A Boyko |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00033 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2016 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Eric Armbrust
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cleveland Clinic Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mike Kolonick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Molly Mateika
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jackie Puntel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Hatcher
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 27 2016
Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate (Related Doc # 19) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/27/2016.(H,CM) |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to vacate
Tue 12/27 2:28 PM
Opinion and Order . Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/27/2016.(H,CM) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 12/27 2:30 PM
Copy of28 Order on Motion to vacate mailed to Sharon Hatcher at 5747 Daniel Drive, Bedford Heights, OH 44146 on 12/27/2016. Related document(s)28 . (H,CM) |
||
oth_evt
Remark
Tue 12/27 2:32 PM
Remark (non-document). Copy of Order28 denying Motion to Vacate mailed and emailed to attorney James Hux on 11/22/2016. Related document(s)28 . (H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Oral Argument
Wed 12/21 11:30 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Oral Argument held on 12/21/2016. Matter taken under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter: Sue Trischan; Time: 30 min.) (H,CM) |
|
Att: 1 Witness List | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Tue 11/22 10:42 AM
Order . Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Settlement is set for Oral Argument on 12/21/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15B. The Court will hear sworn testimony from Plaintiff; Plaintiff's former counsel, James Hux; and defense counsel, Michael N. Chesney. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/22/2016. (H,CM) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 11/22 10:44 AM
Copy of26 Order, mailed to Sharon Hatcher at 5747 Daniel Drive, Bedford Heights, OH 44146 on 11/22/2016. Related document(s)26 . (H,CM) |
||
oth_evt
Remark
Tue 11/22 10:45 AM
Remark (non-document). Copy of Order26 setting oral argument mailed and emailed to attorney James Hux on 11/22/2016. (H,CM) |
||
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
oth_doc
SEALED DOCUMENT
Fri 11/18 2:47 PM
SEALED Document: Affidavit filed by Sharon Hatcher. Related document(s)24 . (Hux, James) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for leave
Fri 11/18 2:06 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting attorney James Hux's Motion for leave to file affidavit under seal . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/18/2016.(H,CM) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
oth_doc
Proposed Order
Thu 11/17 5:16 PM
Proposed Order filed by Sharon Hatcher. Related document(s)22 . (Hux, James) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Leave
Thu 11/17 5:06 PM
Motion for leave to file supporting Affidavit under seal filed by Plaintiff Sharon Hatcher. (Hux, James) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Thu 11/10 11:31 AM
Order . Plaintiff's former attorney, James J. Hux, shall submit an affidavit regarding the allegations in Plaintiff's letter19 and the proceedings of 9/20/2016. The affidavit shall be filed by 11/18/2016. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/10/2016. (H,CM) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Thu 11/10 11:33 AM
Copy of21 Order, mailed to Sharon Hatcher at 5747 Daniel Drive, Bedford Heights, OH 44146 on 11/10/2016. Related document(s)21 . (H,CM) |
||
oth_evt
Remark
Thu 11/10 11:37 AM
Remark (non-document). Copy of Order21 requesting filing by attorney James Hux mailed and emailed to attorney on 11/10/2016. (H,CM) |
||
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
resp
Opposition
Tue 11/08 11:42 AM
Opposition to19 Motion to vacate the Court's Settlement Order filed by All Defendants. (Chesney, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Vacate
Thu 10/27 10:22 AM
Motion (Letter) to vacate order filed by Plaintiff Sharon Hatcher. Related document(s)17 .(B,R) |
|
Att: 1 9/22-23/16 e-mails | ||
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
Thu 09/29 3:56 PM
Order [non-document] granting attorneys of The Spitz Law Firm's Motion to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/29/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 09/28 3:28 PM
Motion by Brian Spitz, James Hux to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Sharon Hatcher. (Hux, James) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/20 2:29 PM
Order . The Court has been advised the action has settled. Case is marked settled and dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce settlement as outlined herein. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/20/2016. (H,CM) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Attorney Substitution
Fri 09/16 4:45 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Marco G. Bocciarelli and adding attorney James J.B. Hux filed by on behalf of Sharon Hatcher. (Hux, James) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge - MJ Vecchiarelli to MJ Greenberg
Mon 08/22 1:16 PM
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (E,P) |
||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 08/01 9:21 AM
Notice to take Deposition of Eric Armbrust, Mike Kolonick, and Molly Matejka on August 17 and 25, 2016 filed by Sharon Hatcher. (Bocciarelli, Marco) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Mon 05/23 4:33 PM
Settlement Conference Order . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/23/2016. (H,CM) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Mon 05/23 11:29 AM
Parties' Joint Proposed Case Management Schedule filed by All Defendants. (Chesney, Michael) |
|
order
Order
Mon 05/23 4:29 PM
Order (non-document). The Court adopts the parties' proposed case management schedule . Non-Expert Discovery due by 9/6/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2016. Settlement Conference set for 9/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/23/2016. (H,CM) |
||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 05/19 11:52 AM
Attorney Appearance of Marco G. Bocciarelli and Peter C. Mapley by Marco G. Bocciarelli filed by on behalf of Sharon Hatcher. (Bocciarelli, Marco) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 05/19 2:49 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Status Conference held on 5/19/2016. Parties shall submit a joint proposed case management schedule by noon on 5/23/2016. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 10 min.) (H,CM) |
||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
Mon 04/11 11:33 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw attorney Sydney Strickland Saffold and substitute attorney Brian D. Spitz . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/11/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/08 4:54 PM
Motion by Sydney Strickland Saffold to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Sharon Hatcher. (Spitz, Brian) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
minutes
Case Management Conference
Fri 03/18 2:48 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Case Management Conference held on 3/18/2016. Case is assigned to the standard track. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/19/2016 at 02:00 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate conference with opposing counsel and contact the Court at 216-357-7151. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 15 min.) (H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Excuse Appearance
Wed 03/16 8:43 AM
Motion to excuse appearance filed by Plaintiff Sharon Hatcher. (Saffold, Sydney) |
|
order
Order on Motion to excuse appearance
Wed 03/16 3:59 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to excuse appearance of client at case management conference . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/16/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Wed 03/09 3:21 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Eric Armbrust, Cleveland Clinic Foundation, Mike Kolonick, Molly Mateika, Jackie Puntel. (Chesney, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Tue 02/09 3:29 PM
Notice of Case Management Conference . Conference to be held on 3/18/2016 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/9/2016.(H,CM) |
|
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Package | ||
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/28 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Clinic Foundation. (Chesney, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint in a Removal Case
Thu 01/28 3:01 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Eric Armbrust, Cleveland Clinic Foundation, Mike Kolonick, Molly Mateika, Jackie Puntel. (Chesney, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Tue 01/12 1:38 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 1/28/2016 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintff's Complaint filed by Eric Armbrust, Cleveland Clinic Foundation, Mike Kolonick, Molly Mateika, Jackie Puntel. (Chesney, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Tue 01/12 3:45 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' unopposed5 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/28/2016 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/12/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Thu 01/07 1:53 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (O,K) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 01/07 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Niro filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Niro, Christina) Modified text on 1/7/2016 (O,K) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/07 1:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Clinic Foundation. (Chesney, Michael) Modified text on 1/7/2016 (O,K) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/07 1:09 PM
Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 15 855289 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-7426403. Filed by Jackie Puntel, Eric Armbrust, Mike Kolonick, Cleveland Clinic Foundation and Molly Mateika. (Chesney, Michael) Modified text on 1/7/2016 (O,K) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Discovery and Stipulation for Leave to Plead, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 01/07 1:51 PM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (O,K) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/07 1:52 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. (O,K) |