California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Case #: 5:16-cv-00078
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2016
Terminated:Mar 10, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2016 2:04 AM PDT
3rd party defendant
Elite Show Services, Inc.
3rd party plaintiff
Forty Niners Football Company, LLC
Represented By
Maria M Lampasona
Lombardi Loper & Conant, LLP
contact info
Matthew Stanley Conant
Lombardi Loper Conant, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Forty Niners Football Company, LLC
Represented By
Maria M Lampasona
Lombardi Loper & Conant, LLP
contact info
Matthew Stanley Conant
Lombardi Loper Conant, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Robert Hilburn
Represented By
Stephen J. Gorog, Jr.
Law Office Of Stephen J. Gorog
contact info
Mark Christian Thomas
Brownstein Thomas, LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 17 2016
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 12:00 p.m. on 6/20/2016, file or cause to be filed a case management conference statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
GPO Jan 17 2017
PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY)- SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC DEADLINES/HEARINGS: The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 1/19/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the Order. Dispositive Motion due by 5/1/2017. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2017 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 8/15/2017 09:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 8/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Further Jury Trial dates:8/16, 8/18, 8/22, 8/23, 8/25/2017 (deliberations). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 10, 2017
46 46 order Order Fri 03/10 11:31 AM
ORDER GRANTING 45 STIPULATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/10/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
45 45 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 03/09 10:09 AM
STIPULATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
44 44 order Order on Stipulation Wed 02/01 8:28 AM
ORDER DISMISSING THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. 21 Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) Modified on 2/1/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
43 43 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 01/31 12:48 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DISMISSAL filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Conant, Matthew) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
42 42 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/18 9:09 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY)- SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC DEADLINES/HEARINGS: The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 1/19/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the Order. Dispositive Motion due by 5/1/2017. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2017 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 8/15/2017 09:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 8/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Further Jury Trial dates:8/16, 8/18, 8/22, 8/23, 8/25/2017 (deliberations). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Statement Tue 01/17 11:32 AM
Statement Filed Jointly re: Trial estimate and availability by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
40 40 motion Appear by Telephone Fri 01/13 3:04 PM
Request to Appear Telephonically for Joint Trial Setting Conference(Humiston, Carol) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
39 39 order Order Fri 01/13 12:33 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/13/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 01/13 4:23 PM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:40 Notice (Other) filed by Elite Show Services, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
38 38 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 01/09 8:32 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by James Robert Hilburn. (Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
37 37 order Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR Wed 10/19 5:29 PM
ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR - Mediation. The parties agree to hold the ADR session by 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2016
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR Fri 10/14 12:30 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
35 35 order Order Thu 09/08 11:31 AM
ORDER Re ADR Deadlines re 33 Stipulation. It is hereby ordered pursuant to the parties' stipulation that: 1) This matter be REMOVED from the Court Mediation program; 2) the parties will participate in private mediation; 3)the parties will circulate names of proposed mediators before 9/30/2016; 4)the parties will confirm a mediator and mediation date on or before 10/14/2016; and 5) the parties agree to complete mediation on or before 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
34 34 misc Proposed Order Tue 09/06 1:03 PM
Proposed Order re33 Stipulation RE ADR DEADLINES by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 09/06 1:00 PM
STIPULATION RE ADR DEADLINES filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
32 32 adr ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held Thu 09/01 2:06 PM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 9/1/2016 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
31 31 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Thu 08/11 5:13 PM
Elite Show Services ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Forty Niners Football Company , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Elite Show Services, Inc. byElite Show Services, Inc.. (Humiston, Carol) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
30 30 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 07/20 9:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC re28 Summons Issued,21 Third Party Complaint to Elite Show Services, Inc. (Conant, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held Wed 07/20 8:49 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/19/2016 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 9/1/2016 at 9:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
28 28 service Summons Issued Mon 07/11 1:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Third-party defendant Elite Show Services, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Proposed Summons Mon 07/11 11:39 AM
Proposed Summons. (Conant, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference Mon 07/11 10:57 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, July 19, 2016, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Proposed Summons Mon 07/11 10:52 AM
Proposed Summons. (Conant, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 07/11 11:22 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]please use Court Form AO 441 Related [+] Summons on Third-Party Complaint This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety.Re:25 Proposed Summons filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
Related: [-] v. 07/10
Monday, June 20, 2016
24 24 order Case Management Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 06/20 10:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is scheduled for a Case Management Conference on 6/23/2016. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement and proposed schedule, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference is VACATED, the Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 22 ) is DISCHARGED, and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 2/3/2017. Designation of Opening Experts with Reports: 2/3/2017. Designation of Rebuttal Experts with Reports: 3/3/2017. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 3/31/2017. Deadline(s) for Filing Discovery Motions: See Civil Local Rule 37-3. Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions: 4/21/2017. Hearing on Anticipated Dispositive Motions set for 6/1/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Trial Setting Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 1/9/2017.(ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2016
23 23 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 06/17 3:56 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by James Robert Hilburn. (Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order to Show Cause Fri 06/17 2:21 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 12:00 p.m. on 6/20/2016, file or cause to be filed a case management conference statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
21 21 cmp Third Party Complaint Thu 06/16 12:46 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Elite Show Services, Inc.. Filed byForty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
20 20 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 06/15 3:28 PM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Defendant shall file the third party complaint as a separate docket entry within 3 days of the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/15/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
19 19 order Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation Tue 06/14 9:08 AM
Order Granting 18 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation Mon 06/13 12:35 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by James Robert Hilburn filed by James Robert Hilburn. (Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
17 17 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Mon 06/06 3:45 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2016
16 16 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 05/10 8:55 AM
RESPONSE Related [+] Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to File a Third Party Complaint filed byJames Robert Hilburn. (Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/10 9:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint . Response due by 5/23/2016. Reply due by 5/31/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/09 5:05 PM
NOTICE by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC re14 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint Amended Notice of Motion (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/09 3:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC.(Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Maria M. Lampasona,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 03/02 3:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/02 12:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/2/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 03/02 11:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/02 11:23 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Robert Hilburn.. (Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/29 1:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC.. (Conant, Matthew) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/29 1:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byForty Niners Football Company, LLC. (Conant, Matthew) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 02/17 11:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/2/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 01/08 3:32 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/08 10:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Forty Niners Football Company, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Fri 01/08 10:25 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 01/07 3:49 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 1/21/2016. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/07 9:36 AM
Proposed Summons. (Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/07 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Forty Niners Football Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10113936.). Filed byJames Robert Hilburn.(Thomas, Mark) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet