Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Lurana S Snow
Case #: 0:16-cv-60045
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:0151 Telegraphs/Telephones - FCC: fees/charges
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2016
Terminated:Jan 26, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2016 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Voicent Communications, Inc
Represented By
Paul Dewey Turner
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Mediator
Gary Cowart
Plaintiff
Marc John
Represented By
Jordan Alexander Shaw
Zebersky Payne
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 26, 2017
30 30 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/26 9:55 AM
ORDER of DISMISSAL Granting29 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Marc John; Dismissing Action with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/26/2017. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/25 3:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Marc John (Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
28 28 order Order to Show Cause Mon 01/23 9:10 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions, up to and including dismissal, should not be imposed. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/20/2017. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2016
27 27 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Tue 05/10 4:15 PM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Gary Cowart. (Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 05/10 12:52 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re25 Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing). Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
25 25 adr Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing) Mon 05/09 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Gary Cowart, Esq. selected. Filed/Added by Marc John. (Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2016
24 24 order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 05/06 4:00 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/6/2016. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
23 23 order Order Mon 04/25 4:15 PM
ORDER TO RESPOND: On or before May 5, 2016, MetroPCS shall filea response to the motion which shall not exceed three pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/25/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Mon 04/25 4:02 PM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/25/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/25 4:21 PM
Set Deadlines as to20 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from MetroPCS Pursuant to a Subpoena Duces Tecum without Deposition . PER DE23 . Responses due by 5/5/2016 (srd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
21 21 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 04/25 3:55 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE : ( Trial set for 3/20/2017 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 3/17/2017 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2016., Discovery due by 11/23/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/25/2016., In Limine Motions due by 3/3/2017., Substantive Pretrial Motions due by 12/23/2016., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/3/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for appropriate disposition of all pretrial discovery motions, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/22/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Compel Fri 04/22 3:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from MetroPCS Pursuant to a Subpoena Duces Tecum without Deposition by Marc John. Responses due by 5/9/2016(Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Subpoena Duces Tecum without Deposition
19 19 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 04/22 10:29 AM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Marc John(Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, April 18, 2016
18 18 order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/18 3:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to follow this Court's Order. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/18/2016. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/10 10:29 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Voicent Communications, Inc. (Turner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 03/02 8:18 AM
ORDER granting15 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Voicent Communications, Inc. Answer due 3/10/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/1/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 02/29 11:20 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Voicent Communications, Inc.(Turner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 22, 2016
14 14 order Order Tue 02/23 2:04 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATON FOR CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER DE12 Stipulation filed by Marc John Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 2/22/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
13 13 order Order Referring Case to Judge Mon 02/22 3:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION AND DISCOVERY: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Motion DE12 and the above-captioned cause are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/19/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 02/18 1:43 PM
STIPULATION for Confidentiality Order (Joint) by Marc John(Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/17 4:21 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marc John (Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 02/11 8:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME :ORDER Granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Voicent Communications, Inc. Answer due 2/24/2016. Re:1 Complaint filed by Marc John. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/10/2016. (srd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 02/09 5:00 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Voicent Communications, Inc.(Turner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/09 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Dewey Turner on behalf of Voicent Communications, Inc. Attorney Paul Dewey Turner added to party Voicent Communications, Inc(pty:dft). (Turner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2016
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 02/08 11:22 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Marc John. Voicent Communications, Inc served on 1/20/2016, answer due 2/10/2016. (Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
6 6 order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 01/12 1:07 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/11/2016. (ail)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/08 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Voicent Communications, Inc. (srd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
4 4 order Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 01/08 9:53 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (srd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Fri 01/08 9:52 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Fri 01/08 9:52 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (srd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Voicent Communications, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8380371, filed by Marc John.(Shaw, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)