John v. Voicent Communications, Inc
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Referred: | Lurana S Snow |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-60045 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0151 Telegraphs/Telephones - FCC: fees/charges |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2016 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Voicent Communications, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Gary Cowart
|
|
Plaintiff
Marc John
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
![]() ORDER of DISMISSAL Granting29 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Marc John; Dismissing Action with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/26/2017. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Marc John (Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions, up to and including dismissal, should not be imposed. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/20/2017. (ls) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Gary Cowart. (Shaw, Jordan) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Tue 05/10 12:52 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re25 Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing). Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (ls) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Gary Cowart, Esq. selected. Filed/Added by Marc John. (Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER granting20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/6/2016. (lh) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER TO RESPOND: On or before May 5, 2016, MetroPCS shall filea response to the motion which shall not exceed three pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/25/2016. (srd) |
|
22 | 22
![]() GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/25/2016. (srd) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 04/25 4:21 PM
Set Deadlines as to20 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from MetroPCS Pursuant to a Subpoena Duces Tecum without Deposition . PER DE23 . Responses due by 5/5/2016 (srd) |
||
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE : ( Trial set for 3/20/2017 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 3/17/2017 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2016., Discovery due by 11/23/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/25/2016., In Limine Motions due by 3/3/2017., Substantive Pretrial Motions due by 12/23/2016., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/3/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for appropriate disposition of all pretrial discovery motions, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/22/2016. (srd) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from MetroPCS Pursuant to a Subpoena Duces Tecum without Deposition by Marc John. Responses due by 5/9/2016(Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Marc John(Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to follow this Court's Order. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/18/2016. (ls) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Voicent Communications, Inc. (Turner, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER granting15 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Voicent Communications, Inc. Answer due 3/10/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/1/2016. (srd) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Voicent Communications, Inc.(Turner, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATON FOR CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER DE12 Stipulation filed by Marc John Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 2/22/2016. (srd) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER REFERRING MOTION AND DISCOVERY: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Motion DE12 and the above-captioned cause are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/19/2016. (srd) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION for Confidentiality Order (Joint) by Marc John(Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marc John (Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME :ORDER Granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Voicent Communications, Inc. Answer due 2/24/2016. Re:1 Complaint filed by Marc John. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/10/2016. (srd) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Voicent Communications, Inc.(Turner, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Dewey Turner on behalf of Voicent Communications, Inc. Attorney Paul Dewey Turner added to party Voicent Communications, Inc(pty:dft). (Turner, Paul) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Marc John. Voicent Communications, Inc served on 1/20/2016, answer due 2/10/2016. (Shaw, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/11/2016. (ail) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to Voicent Communications, Inc. (srd) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Fri 01/08 9:53 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (srd) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 01/08 9:52 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (srd) |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |