California Central District Court
Judge:Beverly Reid O'Connell
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:16-cv-00180
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2016
Terminated:May 23, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2016 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Spotify USA Inc.
Represented By
John Nadolenco
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Daniel E Jones
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
A John P Mancini
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Archis A Parasharami
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Melissa Ferrick
Represented By
Kalpana Srinivasan
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Daniel Boris Lifschitz
Gradstein And Marzano PC
contact info
Henry D Gradstein
Gradstein And Marzano PC
contact info
Stephen E Morrissey
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Steven G Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Krysta Kauble Pachman
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Maryann R Marzano
Gradstein And Marzano PC
contact info
Marc M Seltzer
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Harvey W Geller
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaco Pastorius, Inc.
376 N Harbor City Blvd., B-265
Melbourne, FL 32935
Represented By
Stephen E Morrissey
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Steven G Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Maryann R Marzano
Gradstein And Marzano PC
contact info


1. Spotify hit with second class action lawsuit in two weeks (factmag.com)
Submitted Mon 01/11/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 23, 2016
58 58 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Mon 05/23 9:07 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Minutes Order Administratively Close
57 57 order Consolidate Cases Mon 05/23 9:00 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re: Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Class Counsel47 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court GRANTS the motions to consolidate and hereby ORDERS consolidation of the cases. The low-numbered case, Lowery v. Spotify USA Inc., No. CV 15-09929 BRO (RAOx), is hereby designated the Lead Case, and the Court directs all counsel to file all further documents under Case No. 15-09929 BRO (RAOx) only. The documents should utilize the caption of the original filed case to which they relate. The Court further ORDERS that the Court Clerk administratively close Ferrick v. Spotify USA Inc., No. CV 16-00180 BRO (RAOx) and to add all parties and counsel from Ferrick to Lowery. The Court further GRANTS the Ferrick Plaintiffs motion to appoint interim colead class counsel and hereby appoints Susman Godfrey L.L.P and Gradstein and Marzano, P.C. as interim co-lead class counsel. The Court accordingly DENIES the Lowery Plaintiffs' cross-motion to appoint Michelman and Robinson, LLP as interim lead counsel. A consolidated complaint shall be filed on or before 6/27/2016 at 4:00 PM. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
56 56 order Order Fri 05/20 10:34 AM
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation for Discovery55 (rfi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
55 55 stip Discovery Wed 05/18 11:07 AM
STIPULATION for Discovery as to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc..(Nadolenco, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order