Liu v. Project Investors, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth A Marra |
Case #: | 9:16-cv-80060 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 11, 2016 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Project Investors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Vernon
|
|
Defendant
Lorie Ann Nettles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jinyao Liu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Leidel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
238 | 238
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 03/13 10:19 AM
ORDER granting237 Motion for Leave to Submit Ex Parte Quarterly Report for In Camera Review by North Field Technology Ltd. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (ir) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
237 | 237
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 03/12 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Submit Ex Parte Quarterly Report for In Camera Review by North Field Technology Ltd..(Lewis, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |