Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy G Edmunds
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:16-cv-10118
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2016
Terminated:Aug 30, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 12, 2016 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Officer Bergsma
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Canton Michigan Police Department
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Officer Champagne
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Officer Dunlap
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Officer Harmon
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Officer Kuznicki
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Bergsma
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Champagne
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Dunlap
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Harmon
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Kuznicki
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Nuottila
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Defendant
Woodward
Represented By
Ethan Vinson
Cummings, Mcclorey,
contact info
Plaintiff
Thaddeus R Dickey
6515 Yale Street Apt. 217
Westland, MI 48185

GPO Jul 24 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thaddeus R Dickey, 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Champagne, Dunlap, Harmon, Canton, Charter Township of, Kuznicki, Bergsma, Canton Michigan Police Department Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
GPO Aug 30 2017
ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation 52 denying pltf's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting deft's 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
55 55 order Judgment* Wed 08/30 11:35 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiff; granting deft's motion for summary judgment42 Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
Related: [-]
54 54 order Adopting Report and Recommendation Wed 08/30 11:18 AM
ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation52 denying pltf's47 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting deft's42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 08/30 11:57 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re54 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation,55 Judgment on Thaddeus R Dickey at 6515 Yale Street, Apt 17, Westland, MI 48185. (JCur)
Related: [-]