Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:15-cv-06833
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2015
Terminated:Mar 07, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2016 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant
OTTO'S BMW OF WEST CHESTER
Represented By
ELIZABETH F. WALKER
Campbell Lipski & Dochney
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW QUINN
Represented By
JOSEPH A. RYAN
Ryan Emory & Ryan LLP
contact info
ELIZABETH D. LUBKER
Ryan, Emory & Ryan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Monday, March 07, 2016
10 10 misc Praecipe/Request Mon 03/07 12:04 PM
Praecipe to Settle Discontinue and End by ANDREW QUINN.(RYAN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 04, 2016
misc Letter to Attorney re: L.R. Fri 03/04 12:32 PM
Letter to Attorney Elizabeth D. Lubker re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/17 3:07 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/17/2016 11:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS (3809) BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 02/11 8:51 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by OTTO'S BMW OF WEST CHESTER.(WALKER, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
7 7 misc Report Of Wed 02/10 2:05 PM
Report Of Joint Report For Rule 26(F) Meeting by ANDREW QUINN. (RYAN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2016
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/29 10:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Derek Hand re: served Complaint upon Ottos BMW- Rose Smith by Personal on 01/12/2016 (RYAN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
5 5 order Order Setting Answer Deadline Wed 01/20 2:10 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT HAS AN EXTENSION OF THIRTY (30) DAYS WITHIN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/20/2016. 1/20/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kp, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/19 3:18 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 2/17/2016 11:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS (3809) BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/14 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Conference: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/16/2016 11:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS (3809) BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Electronic Discovery Order,
Att: 2 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/14 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH F. WALKER on behalf of OTTO'S BMW OF WEST CHESTER (WALKER, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
1 1 COMPLAINT against OTTO'S BMW OF WEST CHESTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 132944.), filed by ANDREW QUINN.(tj, )
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to OTTO'S BMW OF WEST CHESTER. Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/29/15 (tj, )
Related: [-]
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANDREW QUINN. (tj, )
Related: [-]