Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40525

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Case #: 4:16-ap-04004
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2016
Terminated:Jun 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
James T. Turner, Jr.
1403 River Oaks Dr.
Richmond Hill, GA 31324
Represented By
James T. Turner, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard P. Van Benschoten
21 W. Park Ave.
Savannah, GA 31401
Represented By
Daniel Christian Jenkins
Karsman, Mckenzie & Hart
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
61 61 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/08 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 59
Monday, June 05, 2017
60 60 court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/05 3:17 PM
Adversary Case 4:16-ap-4004 Closed (CHA)
Related: [-]
59 59 order District Court re: Appeal Mon 06/05 3:14 PM
Final Order By District Court Judge J. Randall Hall, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 4:17-cv-00076 , Dismissed With Prejudice Filed on 6/5/2017 Related [+]. (CHA)
Related: [-] 39 ,40
Friday, June 02, 2017
58 58 misc Stipulation Fri 06/02 3:21 PM
Stipulation By James T. Turner Jr. and and Richard P. Van Benschoten of Dismissal with Prejudice . Filed by C. James McCallar Jr. on behalf of James T. Turner Jr. Related [+] (McCallar, C.)
Related: [-] 1