Dozier v. BMO Harris Bank NA
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles N Clevert, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00071 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 17, 2016 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
BMO Harris Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia A Dozier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Transcript
Fri 05/19 12:43 PM
TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO REOPEN held on 12/14/2016 before Judge Charles Clevert Court Reporter/Transcriber John Schindhelm, Contact at WWW.JOHNSCHINDHELM.COM to order directly... OR. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found[LINK:on our website] or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website[LINK:www.wied.uscourts.gov] Redaction Statement due 6/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017. (Schindhelm, John) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Transcript
Fri 05/19 12:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 3/9/2016 before Judge Charles Clevert Court Reporter/Transcriber John Schindhelm, Contact at WWW.JOHNSCHINDHELM.COM to order directly... OR. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found[LINK:on our website] or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website[LINK:www.wied.uscourts.gov] Redaction Statement due 6/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017. (Schindhelm, John) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Hearing Minutes
Tue 12/27 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Telephonic hearing held on 12/14/16 regarding plaintiff's letter request to reopen. Court does not see any basis to reopen this case. Plaintiff's request for post-judgment relief is denied. (Tape #4:07:36 to 4:28:08) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 12/08 1:54 PM
NOTICE: TELEPHONE HEARING re letter11 is set for 12/14/16 at 4:00 PM before Judge Charles N Clevert Jr. Court will initiate the call. ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
||
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 11/15 9:54 AM
LETTER from Plaintiff's Counsel . (Vaitys, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Wed 03/09 5:06 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 3/9/16. It is ordered and adjudged that the plaintiff, Julia A. Dozier, arbitrate all of her disputes with BMO Harris Bank NA in connection with or relating to her accounts at said bank including, but not limited to breach of contract and/or violation of Wis. Stat. § 100.18, in accordance with the terms of any and all applicable arbitration agreements between the parties, their successors, assigns, or agents. Each party is to bear their own costs and fees. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 03/09 4:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Motions Hearing held on 3/9/16. Defendant's motion to compel arbitration will be granted and judgment shall enter accordingly without costs or attorneys fees.3 Motion to withdraw as plaintiff's counsel is denied as moot.8 Copy of Minute Order sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Tape #3:16:06 to 4:13:12) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Thu 03/10 10:00 AM
Case Terminated (bx) |
||
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/03 10:40 AM
NOTICE: MOTION HEARING is set for 3/9/16 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 222 before Judge Charles N Clevert Jr. Counsel and plaintiff to appear in person. ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
||
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Withdraw
Tue 03/01 9:02 PM
MOTION to Withdraw by Julia A Dozier. (Vaitys, Thomas) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 03/01 10:27 AM
LETTER from Plaintiff's Counsel . (Vaitys, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/01 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D Vaitys on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas Vaitys (Vaitys, Thomas) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Mon 02/29 11:53 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by BMO Harris Bank NA re3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Andalman, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 01/22 12:29 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by BMO Harris Bank NA re3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM .(Andalman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 01/22 12:26 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Andalman, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/19 4:21 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Andalman, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/19 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BMO Harris Bank NA from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 15-CV-010473 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2259877)(Andalman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 01/19 4:29 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site (bx) |