California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Case #: 5:16-cv-00288
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jul 17, 2016 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey J Jones
Jones Day
contact info
Jason S. McDonell
Jones Day
contact info
Brittany Dale Parling
Jones Day
contact info
David Craig Kiernan
Jones Day
contact info
Amir Q Amiri
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey J Jones
Jones Day
contact info
Jason S. McDonell
Jones Day
contact info
Brittany Dale Parling
Jones Day
contact info
David Craig Kiernan
Jones Day
contact info
Amir Q Amiri
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Tesla Motors, Inc
Represented By
David Jeremy Wiener
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Jack Patrick DiCanio
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Derek Francis Foran
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Christopher Leonard Robinson
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Patrick Maben Hammon
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher Flom
contact info
Amy S. Park
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 30 2016
ORDER GRANTING 31 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Tesla Motors, Inc. Attorney Christopher Leonard Robinson for Tesla Motors, Inc added. Attorney Amy S. Park; Jack Patrick DiCanio and Patrick Maben Hammon terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
GPO Jul 22 2016
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Pursuant to Joint Notice of Settlement 50 an Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/25/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/22/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 06, 2016
55 55 order Order on Stipulation Thu 10/06 6:08 PM
ORDER Granting 54 Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. All deadlines/hearings shall be terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
54 54 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 10/04 4:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Tesla Motors, Inc. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
Related: [-]