Cosmetic Alchemy LLC v. SkinMedix
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen M Mcnamee |
Case #: | 2:10-cv-01889 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2010 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2011 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2016 11:18 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Cosmetic Alchemy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aaron J Kozol
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stella International LLC
|
|
Defendant
Scott A Wasserman
|
|
Plaintiff
Cosmetic Alchemy LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Stella International LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Scott A Wasserman
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Aaron J Kozol
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
SkinMedix
Terminated: 09/30/2010
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, November 02, 2011 | ||
49 | 49 ORDER granting48 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, with parties to bear their own costs and fees. Defendants/Counterclaimant's Motion for Leaveto File Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint (Doc. 43) is denied as moot, and all other pending deadlines are vacated. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/2/11. (DMT) | |
Tuesday, November 01, 2011 | ||
48 | 48 *STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Stella International LLC, Scott A Wasserman, Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, Aaron J Kozol.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 11/2/2011 (CMAL). | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 14, 2011 | ||
47 | 47 ORDER granting46 Stipulation Plaintiff/Counterdefendants SecondStipulated Request for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants/ CounterClaimants Motion to Amend the Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counterdefendants Response shall be due October 28, 2011.Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/14/2011. (TCA) | |
Thursday, October 13, 2011 | ||
46 | 46 STIPULATION (Second) Request for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants/Counterclaimants' Motion to Amend the Complaint by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Stella International LLC, Scott A Wasserman.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 26, 2011 | ||
45 | 45 ORDER granting44 Stipulation, the Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and theThird-party Defendants an additional fourteen (14) days to file their Response. The Response shall be due October 14, 2011.Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/26/2011. (TCA) | |
Thursday, September 22, 2011 | ||
44 | 44 STIPULATION re43 First MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Request for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants'/Counterclaimants' Motion to Amend the Complaint by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Stella International LLC, Scott A Wasserman.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 13, 2011 | ||
43 | 43 *First MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, Aaron J Kozol, Aaron J Kozol, SkinMedix.(Loeffler, Erica) *Modified on 9/13/2011, document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c), (LSP).* | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Pleading | ||
Tuesday, July 26, 2011 | ||
42 | 42 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/17/2012. Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/26/2011. (see order for details)(TCA) | |
41 | 41 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stephen M McNamee: Appearances: Jeffrey Weiss for plaintiffs; Erica Loeffler for defendants; Clients Scott Wasserman and Aaron KozolScheduling Conference held on 7/26/2011. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a scheduling order. (ECRO Vicki Reger.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) | |
Tuesday, July 19, 2011 | ||
40 | 40 NOTICE re DEFENDANTS INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, Aaron J Kozol. (Campillo, Michael) | |
39 | 39 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiff/Counterdefendant's and Third Party Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Stella International LLC, Scott A Wasserman. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
38 | 38 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Stella International LLC, Scott A Wasserman. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Monday, July 18, 2011 | ||
37 | 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
36 | 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stella International LLC. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Tuesday, July 05, 2011 | ||
35 | 35 Third Party Defendants' Answer to Gulf Coast Medical Group, LLC d/b/a Skinmedix's and Aaron J. Kozol's Third-Party Complaint ANSWER to18 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Stella International LLC, Scott A Wasserman.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Tuesday, June 28, 2011 | ||
34 | 34 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/28/2011. (See Order Details)(TCA) | |
Wednesday, May 25, 2011 | ||
33 | 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron J Kozol, Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, Aaron J Kozol. Stella International LLC waiver sent on 5/4/2011. (Loeffler, Erica) | |
32 | 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron J Kozol, Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, Aaron J Kozol. Scott A Wasserman waiver sent on 5/4/2011. (Loeffler, Erica) | |
31 | 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron J Kozol, Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, Aaron J Kozol. Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC waiver sent on 5/4/2011. (Loeffler, Erica) | |
Monday, May 23, 2011 | ||
30 | 30 Answer to Counterclaims ANSWER to18 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC, .(Cao, Veronica-Adele) *Modified on 5/24/2011 to remove the additional filers* (DMT). | |
Friday, May 20, 2011 | ||
29 | 29 Minute Order: Scheduling Conference reset for 7/26/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) | |
Tuesday, May 17, 2011 | ||
28 | 28 TEXT-ONLY Minute Order: This case is reassigned from the Honorable Susan R Bolton to the Honorable Stephen M McNamee. All future documents filed shall reflect the initials SMM as part of the complete case number. All deadlines and hearings are affirmed unless reset by subsequent order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) | |
Monday, May 09, 2011 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 terminating25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; terminating26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) | |
24 | 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re22 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward M. Livingson filed by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC,23 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Erica L. Loeffler filed by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC. Description of deficiency: Incorrect forms, filed by in-state attorney for ineligible out of state attorneys, no certificates of good standing, no proposed form of order required. Please see attached pdf for further information. (BAS) | |
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX109380 as to Erica L Loeffler. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) | ||
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX109379 as to Edward M Livingston. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) | ||
Friday, May 06, 2011 | ||
26 | 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Erica L Loeffler on behalf of Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, and Aaron J Kozol. (BAS) | |
25 | 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward M Livingston on behalf of Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC, and Aaron J Kozol. (BAS) | |
23 | 23 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Erica L. Loeffler by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC.(Campillo, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order re Erica Loeffler | ||
22 | 22 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward M. Livingson by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC.(Campillo, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order re Ed. Livingston | ||
Wednesday, April 20, 2011 | ||
21 | 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC. (Campillo, Michael) | |
Monday, April 18, 2011 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2011 at 03:15 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton [see Order for full details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/18/11. (MAW) | |
Thursday, April 14, 2011 | ||
19 | 19 NOTICE TO PARTY Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC. (MAW) | |
Wednesday, April 13, 2011 | ||
18 | 18 ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Stella International LLC, Kurt Wasserman Consulting LLC, Scott A. Wasserman, COUNTERCLAIM against Cosmetic Alchemy LLC by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC.(Campillo, Michael) | |
Tuesday, March 22, 2011 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants shall have until April 13, 2011, to file their responsive pleading in this action. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/22/11.(MAW) | |
Monday, March 21, 2011 | ||
16 | 16 *First MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer(Unopposed) by Gulf Coast Medical Group LLC.(Campillo, Michael) *Modified on 3/21/2011; corrected from extension of time to file response/reply* (DMT). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Index and Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, March 01, 2011 | ||
15 | 15 SERVICE by Publication filed by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC. Last publication date 02/17/2011.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Wednesday, January 05, 2011 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time To complete service. Plaintiff may have until March 4, 2011 to serve Defendants with the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/5/11.(DMT) | |
Tuesday, January 04, 2011 | ||
13 | 13 DECLARATION of Veronica-Adele dela Roca Cao re12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service by Plaintiff Cosmetic Alchemy LLC.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
12 | 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 07, 2010 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after January 4, 2011, unless before then Plaintiff has served defendant with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/7/10. (DMT) | |
Friday, October 01, 2010 | ||
10 | 10 Summons Issued as to Gulf Coast Medical Group, LLC d/b/a SkinMedix, Aaron J. Kozol.(MHA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, September 30, 2010 | ||
9 | 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re6 Amended Complaint Exhibit A to Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Cosmetic Alchemy LLC. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
8 | 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC. (Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
6 | 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gulf Coast Medical Group, LLC d/b/a SkinMedix, Aaron J. Kozol, filed by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC.(Cao, Veronica-Adele) | |
Friday, September 03, 2010 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to SkinMedix. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. | |
4 | 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-4301392. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 10-1889 PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC (submitted by Jeffrey Weiss). (REK) | |
2 | 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC (submitted by Jeffrey Weiss). (REK) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-4301392, filed by Cosmetic Alchemy LLC (submitted by Jeffrey Weiss).(REK) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |