Bernal Castro v. USA
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer G Zipps |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00035 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 03/16 1:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's Order filed March 16, 2016, movants motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is denied and the civil action opened in connection is hereby dismissed. (KEP) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 03/16 1:14 PM
ORDERED: The Clerk of Court must terminate Doc. 97 in CR 12-00756 TUC-JGZ(LAB). The4 Amended Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (in CV 16-00035 TUC-JGZ) is denied and the civil action opened in connection with the original § 2255 Motion (CV 16-00035 TUC-JGZ) is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. In the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 3/15/2016. (KEP) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Tue 03/08 10:07 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner Francisco Antonio Bernal Castro. (BAC) |
|
4 | 4
mot2255
Amended Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 03/08 9:45 AM
AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Francisco Antonio Bernal Castro.(BAC) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 02/08 2:56 PM
ORDER, Within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, Movant must file either a notice withdrawing the Motion for Time Reduction (Doc. 1 in CV 16-35-TUC-JGZ), or an amended "Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct a Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255)," on the court-approved form provided with this Order. If Movant files a notice of withdrawal or fails to file an amended motion within 30 days, the Motion for Time Reduction is denied (Doc. 97 in CR 12-756-TUC-JGZ) and the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of the civil action opened in connection with the Motion for Time Reduction, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/8/16. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 01/20 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (FKD) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Wed 01/20 2:57 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No 12-CR-756-TUC-JGZ-LAB filed by Francisco Antonio Bernal Castro. (2 pages)(FKD) |
|
Att: 1 envelope |