Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund et al v. Marine Industries Northwest, Inc.
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Lungstrum |
Referred: | Kenneth G Gale |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02048 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 19, 2016 4:15 AM CDT |
Defendant
Marine Industries Northwest, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fultz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/13 11:52 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per 16 Stipulation of Dismissal.(hl) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/12 4:17 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz. (Krstulic, Carol) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Order
Tue 10/11 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report and Request That Case be Passed for Settlement (Doc. 14). The stay previously entered in this case on 4/19/2016 is continued to 11/15/2016 by which time the case will be dismissed or another Joint Status Report will be filed regarding status of settlement efforts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/11/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/10 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Request that Case be Passed for Settlement by Marine Industries Northwest, Inc.. (Oldvader, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Reassigning Case
Mon 05/16 11:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case Signed by deputy clerk on 5/16/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(daw) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Stay Case
Tue 04/19 3:04 PM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings. For good cause shown, the Court finds a stay of further pretrial proceedings to be appropriate. Accordingly, all pretrial proceedings, including the 4/25/2016 Scheduling Conference and the 4/18/2016 deadline for submitting the parties' planning report and Rule 26(a) initial disclosures, are hereby stayed. This stay shall expire on 10/7/2016. No later than 9/30/2016, the parties shall jointly file a status report concerning the result of the efforts to resolve the disputes between Defendant and its former lessor and their insurers and any other matter relevant to this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/19/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay Case
Mon 04/18 8:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case and Response to Court Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling by Defendant Marine Industries Northwest, Inc. (Oldvader, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/13 1:51 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stanley G. Schroeder for Marine Industries Northwest, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/13/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/13 11:43 AM
MOTION for attorney Stanley G. Schroeder to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3743153.) by Defendant Marine Industries Northwest, Inc. (Oldvader, Jennifer) (Main Document 9 replaced to remove the proposed order that was attached on 4/13/2016) (hw). Modified on 4/13/2016 (hw) |
|
Att: 1 ECF Registration Form | ||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/07 10:30 AM
NOTICE CONCERNING WAIVER OF POTENTIAL JUDICIAL DISQUALIFICATION re7 Order : If a party or their counsel does not wish to waive the potential disqualification, a letter to that effect, concisely stating the factual basis for disqualification, must be received by the Clerk of the Court on or before March 21, 2016. (ses) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Mon 03/07 10:27 AM
ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL FOR JUDICIAL DISQUALIFICATION - Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/07/2016. (ses) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Fri 03/04 4:40 PM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2016 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosure deadline 4/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/4/2016. (ts) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/04 2:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Marine Industries Northwest, Inc..(Oldvader, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Tue 02/16 9:53 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until March 4, 2016 for Defendant Marine Industries Northwest, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 2/16/2016. (ydm) |
|
Monday, February 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Mon 02/15 11:08 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz upon Marine Industries Northwest, Inc. served on 1/29/2016, answer due 2/19/2016 (Krstulic, Carol) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/21 9:28 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz. (Krstulic, Carol) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Thu 01/21 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3661655.), filed by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz.(Krstulic, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-10-4-10 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-1-13-11 Letter | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 01/21 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/21 12:22 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marine Industries Northwest, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ydm) |