Carson v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher A Boyko |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00165 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 20, 2016 5:30 AM EDT |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
|
|
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hattie Carson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Terminated: 06/10/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis US Inc.
Terminated: 06/10/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Remark
Wed 10/19 3:20 PM
Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in Eastern District of Louisiana as case 2:16-cv-15322, filed 10/19/2016. (W,CM) |
||
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - MDL Case Termination
Fri 10/14 11:57 AM
Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, In Re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation, transferring the within action to the Eastern District of Louisiana and assigned to the Honorable Lance M. Africk. (R,Sh) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge - MJ Vecchiarelli to MJ Greenberg
Mon 08/22 1:29 PM
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (E,P) |
||
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to stay
Tue 08/16 11:23 AM
Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to stay proceedings and deadlines pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/16/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/12 4:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sanofi S.A.. (Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Fri 08/12 4:58 PM
Joint Motion to stay all Proceedings and Reset the Deadlines for Aventis Pharma S.A. and Sanofi S.A. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support | ||
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/05 11:58 AM
Motion for attorney J. Kyle Bachus to Appear Pro Hac Vice (unsigned). Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7744753, filed by Plaintiff Hattie Carson. (Gold, Ned) Modified on 8/5/2016. No signature line or certificate of service on motion.(G,CA) |
|
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 08/05 3:05 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for attorney J. Kyle Bachus to appear pro hac vice . Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/5/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/27 4:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Aventis Pharma S.A. filed by Aventis Pharma S.A.. (Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Tue 07/26 12:02 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant Aventis Pharma's8 Motion for Extension of Time until 8/29/2016 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/26/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/25 6:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi S.A. for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 07/25 6:56 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support - Memorandum in Support of sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Taxotere Labeling | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension (other)
Mon 07/25 3:49 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 29, 2016 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Aventis Pharma S.A.. (Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to amend complaint
Tue 06/14 11:29 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to file amended complaint instanter . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/14/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/10 5:39 PM
First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Hattie Carson. (Gold, Ned) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Amend Complaint
Fri 06/10 5:34 PM
Motion to amend complaint instanter filed by Plaintiff Hattie Carson.(Gold, Ned) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to extend deadlines
Wed 05/25 1:56 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' unopposed Motion to extend deadlines . Plaintiff shall file First Amended Complaint by 6/7/2016; Defendants shall respond by 7/25/2016. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/25/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension (of deadlines)
Tue 05/24 5:47 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint until July 25, 2016 filed by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Klarfeld, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 05/10 2:10 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Defendant Sanofi US Services, Inc., filed on behalf of Plaintiff Hattie Carson. (E,CK) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 05/09 3:38 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Defendants Aventis Pharma S.A. on 5/5/2016; Sanofi US Services, Inc. on 5/5/2016; Sanofi-Aventis US Inc. on 5/5/2016; Sanofi-Aventis US LLC on 5/5/2016, filed on behalf of Plaintiff Hattie Carson. (H,SN) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Service by Clerk
Tue 05/03 4:25 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Aventis Pharma S.A. receipt # 7015 1520 0001 1038 9740, Sanofi S.A. receipt # 7015 1520 0001 1038 9757, Sanofi US Services Inc. receipt # 7015 0640 0003 3088 7701, Sanofi-Aventis US Inc. receipt # 7015 1520 0001 1038 9764, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC receipt # 7015 0640 0003 3088 7695, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (E,CK) |
||
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 8:36 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US Inc. & Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (C,BA) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 01/25 8:15 AM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (C,BA) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/25 8:15 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. (C,BA) |
||
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/22 10:37 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Hattie Carson. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7448994. Filed by Hattie Carson. (Gold, Ned) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Sanofi S.A., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Aventis Pharma S.A., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc. |