Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:15-bk-31324

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Olson
Case #: 0:16-ap-01053
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2016
Terminated:Apr 25, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC
901 South Federal Highway
Hallandale, FL 33009
Represented By
The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc.
Corporation Services Company 1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.
The Village of Gulfstream Park, 1560 801 Silks Run Road
Hallandale, FL 33009
Represented By
Gary M Murphree
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 25, 2016
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/25 2:37 PM
Adversary Case 0:16-ap-1053 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 03/24 12:40 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Interested Party Sonya Salkin. (Salkin, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/19 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/18/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint. Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is Extended Through and Including March 23, 2016. (Re:14 )
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
17 17 order Extend Time Order Wed 03/16 11:03 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint. Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is Extended Through and Including March 23, 2016. Related [+] (Langohr, Christa)
Related: [-] #14
Thursday, March 10, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 03/10 2:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Sonya Salkin Filed by Attorney Mark Bonacquisti. (Salkin, Sonya)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 03/10 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Mark Bonacquisti Filed by Attorney Mark Bonacquisti. (Bonacquisti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
14 14 motion Extend Time Wed 03/09 5:25 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Response To Complaint Filed by Defendants Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc., The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/05 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Response to Complaint. The Defendants Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is Extended Through and Including March 9, 2016. (Re:10 )
Thursday, March 03, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address (Attorney) Thu 03/03 11:53 AM
Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Jason Z. Jones Filed by Defendants Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc., The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC. (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
11 11 order Extend Time Order Wed 03/02 1:52 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Response to Complaint. The Defendants Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is Extended Through and Including March 9, 2016. Related [+] (Langohr, Christa)
Related: [-] #10
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
10 10 motion Extend Time Wed 02/24 7:19 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint Filed by Defendants Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc., The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2016
9 9 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Mon 01/25 11:28 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Langohr, Christa)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Summons Issued Mon 01/25 11:27 AM
Summons Issued on Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc. Answer Due 2/24/2016; The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC Answer Due 2/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/27/2016 at 09:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Langohr, Christa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.
Friday, January 22, 2016
7 7 misc Document Fri 01/22 4:59 PM
Complaint-Part 7 Filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.. (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Document Fri 01/22 4:58 PM
Complaint-Part 6 Filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.. (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Document Fri 01/22 4:57 PM
Complaint-Part 5 Filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.. (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Document Fri 01/22 4:56 PM
Complaint-Part 4 Filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.. (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Document Fri 01/22 4:56 PM
Complaint-Part 3 Filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.. (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document Fri 01/22 4:55 PM
Complaint-Part 2 Filed by Plaintiff American Pie Pizzeria, Inc.. (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/22 4:54 PM
Adversary case 16-01053 Complaint by American Pie Pizzeria, Inc. against The Village of Gulfstream Park, LLC, Bravo Brio Restaurant Group, Inc.. Part 1 Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Murphree, Gary)
Related: [-]