Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Thomas B Smith
Case #: 6:16-cv-00112
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jul 23, 2016 6:10 AM EDT
Defendant
HCL Inc.
Defendant
Walt Disney World
Defendant
HCL America, Inc.
Represented By
Charles B. Casper
Montgomery, Mccracken, Walker & Rhoads, LLP
contact info
Richard S. Dellinger
Lowndes, Drosdick, Doster, Kantor & Reed, PA
contact info
Defendant
Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Represented By
David W. Ogden
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Glennys Ortega Rubin
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Alan Schoenfeld
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Colin Reardon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Mary Ruth Houston
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Leo Perrero
Represented By
Sara Blackwell
The Blackwell Firm
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
51 51 order Order Wed 11/30 9:14 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/30/2016. (ED)
Related: [-]