Original Case: 1:15-cv-05736

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-03839
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2015
Terminated:Jan 21, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Jan 28, 2016 6:14 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
Antonette Au Dream
Represented By
Antonette Au Dream
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Buffie the Body
Represented By
Buffie the Body
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Lil Scrappy
Represented By
Lil Scrappy
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Nelly
Represented By
Nelly
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Cool S. Dre
Represented By
Cool S. Dre
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Pharrell Williams
Represented By
Pharrell Williams
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Swiss Beats
Represented By
Swiss Beats
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Direct Industries
Defendant - Appellee
Tyger Booty
Represented By
Tyger Booty
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Amazin Amie
Represented By
Amazin Amie
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dolly Castro
Represented By
Dolly Castro
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Yolie Monroe
Represented By
Yolie Monroe
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ashley Logan
Represented By
Ashley Logan
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Joann Shari
Represented By
Joann Shari
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bella Sandiego
Represented By
Bella Sandiego
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ms. Damn
Represented By
Ms. Damn
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Double Dose Twins
Represented By
Double Dose Twins
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Spanish Fly 1 and only
Defendant - Appellee
Debrah Brugant
Represented By
Debrah Brugant
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Cruise Da Fatrie
Defendant - Appellee
Shelly Rosay
Defendant - Appellee
Guganese Jumbie
Defendant - Appellee
Cashmere Rosas
Defendant - Appellee
Ronnie Ortiz
Represented By
Ronnie Ortiz
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
D.J. Pauly D.
Represented By
D.J. Pauly D.
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Court Call
Represented By
Court Call
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Isle Blue, LLC
Represented By
Isle Blue, LLC
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Alliance Air Freight & Logistics
Represented By
Alliance Air Freight & Logistics
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Rhapsody
Represented By
Rhapsody
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Gotham Ghostwriters
Represented By
Gotham Ghostwriters
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Luxury Retreats
Defendant - Appellee
Melonin Paramore
Defendant - Appellee
Alexs Skyy
Represented By
Alexs Skyy
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TT
Represented By
Defendant - Appellee
Propatu
Represented By
Propatu
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dana Lee
Represented By
Dana Lee
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Kyra Chaos
Represented By
Kyra Chaos
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
L.A. Brown
Represented By
L.A. Brown
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sandi Graham
Represented By
Sandi Graham
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
D.J. Franzen
Represented By
D.J. Franzen
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Mizz Twerksum
Represented By
Mizz Twerksum
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Lady Luscious
Represented By
Lady Luscious
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Wingzito
Represented By
Wingzito
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Mallymall
Represented By
Mallymall
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Kingari
Represented By
Kingari
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jesenia Aang
Represented By
Jesenia Aang
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Kaposlyfe
Represented By
Kaposlyfe
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Young Bouncer
Represented By
Young Bouncer
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Lucrano the Boss
Represented By
Lucrano the Boss
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Consequence
Represented By
Consequence
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Niggas Hate Bugatti
Represented By
Niggas Hate Bugatti
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Cluwonant
Represented By
Cluwonant
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
O. Torres
Represented By
O. Torres
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bigwest
Represented By
Bigwest
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Rico
Represented By
Rico
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Tbt
Represented By
Tbt
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Reepuncity
Represented By
Reepuncity
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PRdastar
Represented By
PRdastar
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Kushedgod
Represented By
Kushedgod
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bitches Lou fatboy
Represented By
Bitches Lou fatboy
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Prime Multi Suc
Represented By
Prime Multi Suc
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Young Squad
Represented By
Young Squad
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Euro Salif
Represented By
Euro Salif
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Nofrisbee
Represented By
Nofrisbee
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Gilbert Arenas
Represented By
Gilbert Arenas
-
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Desmond M. Witherspoon
Represented By
Desmond M. Witherspoon
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/07/2023 5:36 AM EST
Monday, November 23, 2015
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Desmond M. Witherspoon, FILED. [1653505] 15-3839 [Entered: 12/01/2015 11:13 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1653511] 15-3839 [Entered: 12/01/2015 11:16 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1653519] 15-3839 [Entered: 12/01/2015 11:19 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Desmond M. Witherspoon, FILED. No Service by US mail.[1653524] 15-3839 [Entered: 12/01/2015 11:23 AM]
Related: [-]