Illinois Southern District Court
Case #: 3:10-cv-00685
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2010
Terminated:Oct 15, 2012
Defendant
Medicate Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant
Michael Schaltenbrand
Plaintiff
Mark A Swift

GPO Sep 15 2010
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff show cause why cases should not be severed. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/15/2010. (dka, )
GPO Oct 15 2012
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/jdh) See judgment.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/15/2012. (jdh)
GPO Jan 30 2014
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court toenter judgment in favor of defendants/counterclaimants Medicate Pharmacy, Inc. and Michael L.Schaltenbrand and against plaintiff/counter-defendant DeliverMed on Counterclaim 1 of theDeliverMed Action (No. 10-cv-684-JPG-DGW) for a declaration of copyright invalidity anddeclaring that DeliverMeds Certificate of Copyright Registration VA-1-766-676 for the 2-Dartwork known as the house and pestle logo (VA 1-766-676) is invalid. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 01/29/2014. (msd, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.