New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:16-cv-00545
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2016
Terminated:Dec 28, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jul 31, 2016 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
David John Fioccola
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Tiffani B Figueroa
Morrison Foerster
contact info
Adam James Hunt
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saizhang Guan
Represented By
Anne Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Longbin Li
Represented By
Anne Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kai Peng
Represented By
Anne Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info

GPO Feb 23 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, Defendant's motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. These proceedings are stayed pending arbitration of Plaintiffs' claims. The parties are directed to inform the Court of any resolution of the arbitration proceedings, or any other event, that would affect the stay of this matter. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/23/2017. (Gregorio, Heather)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Wed 04/02 2:38 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. The16 Notice has been deleted as it was entered in the incorrect case. (LC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/28 1:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The41 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/28/2017. (Abdallah, Fida)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/18 4:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/24 10:28 AM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tiffani B. Figueroa's request to withdraw is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 3/24/2017. (Naidich, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
40 40 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 03/17 8:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Tiffani B. Figueroa) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/17 8:10 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Tiffani B. Figueroa) by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 23, 2017
38 38 order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 02/23 5:51 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, Defendant's motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. These proceedings are stayed pending arbitration of Plaintiffs' claims. The parties are directed to inform the Court of any resolution of the arbitration proceedings, or any other event, that would affect the stay of this matter. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/23/2017. (Gregorio, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
37 37 misc Letter Tue 02/14 4:55 PM
Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Scroggins v. Uber Techs. Inc.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Gunn v. Uber Techs. Inc.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Richmond v. Uber Techs. Inc.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Singh v. Uber Techs. Inc.
Friday, January 06, 2017
36 36 misc Letter Fri 01/06 6:10 PM
Letter in Response to Defendants' 1/4/17 Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority (D.E. 35) by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Marc v. Uber Techs., Inc. Opinion and Order
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
35 35 misc Letter Wed 01/04 7:40 PM
Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Zawada Opinion and Order
Friday, November 04, 2016
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Mon 11/07 10:57 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information - The #35 Minute Entry has been deleted from the above-referenced case as it was docketed in error. It has been docketed in the correct case 2:16-CR-00545-ADS. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
34 34 misc Letter Mon 09/26 1:39 PM
Letter Re: Response to Notice filed by Defendants on 9.22.16 by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
33 33 misc Letter Thu 09/22 11:58 AM
Letter Notifying the Court of the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois' Opinion and Order in Lee, et al. v. Uber Technologies, Inc., et al. (Case No. 15cv11756 by Uber Technologies, Inc.) (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Copy of Opinion and Order from Lee, et al. v. Uber Technologies, Inc., et al.
Thursday, September 08, 2016
32 32 misc Letter Thu 09/08 7:18 PM
Letter Notifying the Court of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit's Decision in Mohamed v. Uber Technologies, Inc., et al., No. 15-16178 (9th Cir. Sept. 7, 2016) by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 06/28 3:50 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/28/2016. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
31 31 misc Letter Wed 06/01 4:35 PM
Letter Accompanying Courtesy Copies of Documents Related to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 06/01 4:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Declaration of David J. Fioccola in Further Support) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
29 29 respoth Reply in Support Wed 06/01 4:29 PM
REPLY in Support re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/01 4:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Declaration of Longbin Li) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/01 4:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Declaration of Saizhang Guan) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/01 4:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Declaration of Kai Peng) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/01 4:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Affidavit of C.K. Lee) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
24 24 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Wed 06/01 4:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 06/01 4:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Declaration of David J. Fioccola) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
22 22 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 06/01 4:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Declaration of Michael Colman) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L
21 21 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 06/01 4:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Compel Wed 06/01 4:06 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
19 19 misc Letter Wed 05/18 11:21 PM
Letter by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 04/20 3:18 PM
ORDER terminating13 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Defendant shall re-file the motion once it is fully briefed. Plaintiff shall serve its opposition, if any, by 5/18/15. Defendant shall serve its reply, if any, by 6/1/16. Ordered by Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr. on 4/20/2016. (Pownall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
18 18 misc Letter Tue 04/19 11:31 AM
Letter Regarding Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Hunt, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/19 10:54 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The Stipulation Staying Defendant's Time to Answer is SO ORDERED. The time for defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action shall be stayed until 30 days after the entry of an order denying defendant's motion to compel arbitration, which is currently pending before the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/19/2016. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/18 7:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 04/18 7:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration - Declaration of David J. Fioccola in Support of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
15 15 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 04/18 7:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration - Declaration of Michael Colman in Support of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L
14 14 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 04/18 6:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Compel Mon 04/18 6:53 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/22 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffani B Figueroa on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Figueroa, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/22 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam James Hunt on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hunt, Adam)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/22 12:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/22 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David John Fioccola on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Fioccola, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/19 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/19 12:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 02/19 10:41 AM
STIPULATION Extending Defendants Time to Answer by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 02/19 10:33 AM
STIPULATION Extending Defendants Time to Answer by Saizhang Guan, Longbin Li, Kai Peng (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Requirement Fri 02/19 10:56 AM
Notice to Counsel re documents5 &6 Stipulation Extending Defendants Time to Answer. You are required to file "All letters to Magistrate Judge Reyes requesting Court intervention, including those sent pursuant to Local Civil Rules 37.1 and 37.3, or requesting an adjournment or extension of discovery deadlines, must be electronically filed under "Motions" and not "Letter" under "Other Documents." . Please consult the judge's individual practice rules. (Vertus, Miriam) Modified on 2/19/2016 (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/19 12:28 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. answer is due 4/18/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/19/2016. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 02/03 9:14 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 02/03 9:13 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/02 6:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/02 6:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Uber Technologies, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8348504 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kai Peng, Longbin Li, Saizhang Guan. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/03 9:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]