Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:Harwell G Davis, III
Case #: 5:16-cv-00207
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2016
Terminated:May 10, 2016
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2016 3:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Rafael Edward Cruz
Plaintiff
Shannon Duncan
Represented By
Thomas E Drake, II
The Drake Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Sebastian Green
Represented By
Thomas E Drake, II
The Drake Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Parker
Represented By
Thomas E Drake, II
The Drake Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathryn Spears
Represented By
Thomas E Drake, II
The Drake Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Spears
Represented By
Thomas E Drake, II
The Drake Law Firm
contact info

Docket last updated: 02/16/2016 10:22 AM CST
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT against Rafael Edward Cruz filed by Sebastian Green, Shannon Duncan, Kyle Spears, Jerry Parker, and Kathryn Spears.(SPT )
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs AMENDED Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Shannon Duncan, Sebastian Green, Jerry Parker, Kathryn Spears, Kyle Spears. (Drake, Thomas) Modified on 2/5/2016 (SPT ).
Related: [-]