Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Lee H Rosenthal
Case #: 4:16-cv-00293
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2016
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2016 4:00 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Canrig Drilling Technology LTD
Represented By
Bradford T Laney
Raley & Bowick, LLP
contact info
John Wesley Raley
Raley & Bowick, L.L.P.
contact info
Bradford Turner Laney
Raley Bowick LLP
contact info
Robert M Bowick, Jr
Raley & Bowick L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Auto-Dril, Inc.
Represented By
Meagan Wilder Glover
Gray Reed & Mcgraw, P.C.
contact info
Russell Erin Jumper
Looper, Reed & Mcgraw
contact info
Michael D. Ellis
Gray Reed Mcgraw PC
contact info
David Greer Henry
Gray Reed & Mcgraw
contact info
John P. Palmer
Naman Howell Smith & Lee
contact info
James L Reed, Jr
Gray Reed & Mcgraw
contact info
Defendant
Canrig Drilling Technology LTD
Represented By
Bradford T Laney
Raley & Bowick, LLP
contact info
John Wesley Raley
Raley & Bowick, L.L.P.
contact info
Bradford Turner Laney
Raley Bowick LLP
contact info
Robert M Bowick, Jr
Raley & Bowick L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Auto-Dril, Inc.
Represented By
Meagan Wilder Glover
Gray Reed & Mcgraw, P.C.
contact info
Russell Erin Jumper
Looper, Reed & Mcgraw
contact info
Michael D. Ellis
Gray Reed Mcgraw PC
contact info
David Greer Henry
Gray Reed & Mcgraw
contact info
John P. Palmer
Naman Howell Smith & Lee
contact info
James L Reed, Jr
Gray Reed & Mcgraw
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2017
ORDER entered regarding the resetting of the Markman hearing.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
GPO Apr 11 2018
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING 62 Third MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness. A Status Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
GPO Apr 20 2018
AMEDNED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.