Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10083

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 4:16-bk-40741
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2016
Dismissed:Nov 09, 2016
Terminated:Dec 29, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
NHB Capital, LLC
801 Crescent Drive, Suite 600
Franklin, TN 37067
Represented By
Christopher J. Lawhorn
Carmody Macdonald P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 29, 2016
7 7 order Final Decree Thu 12/29 4:57 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 350(a) and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 3022. (ahl, s)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/29 5:16 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ahl, s)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
6 6 order Dismissing Case - BK Wed 11/09 4:11 PM
Order Pursuant to Sections 349 and 1112(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 1017 Dismissing the Chapter 11 Cases Upon Occurrence of Certain Conditions. (ahl, s)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2016
5 5 court Document Thu 04/21 2:12 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of this case with that of Noranda Aluminum, Inc., Case No. 16-10083 399. The Chapter 11 case of Noranda Aluminum, Inc. should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (pot, t)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
4 4 order Joint Administration Tue 02/09 4:46 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 i, k
Monday, February 08, 2016
3 3 motion Joint Administration Mon 02/08 3:45 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor NHB Capital, LLC (Lawhorn, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 02/08 3:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-40741 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 12338423, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Mon 02/08 2:23 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by NHB Capital, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 08/8/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 2/22/2016.Schedule A/B due 2/22/2016. Schedule D due 2/22/2016.Schedule E/F due 2/22/2016. Schedule G due 2/22/2016. Schedule H due 2/22/2016. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 2/22/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/22/2016. Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/7/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 06/7/2016. (Lawhorn, Christopher)
Related: [-]