New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:12-bk-22475
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2012
Dismissed:Aug 16, 2012
Terminated:Nov 28, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
H.E. Judson Development Corp.
189 Route 59
Spring Valley, NY 10977-5201
Represented By
Robert S. Lewis
Robert S. Lewis, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 03/24/2012 5:51 PM EDT
Monday, March 05, 2012
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-22475 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8345762. Fee amount 1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/31/2012, Filed by Robert S. Lewis of Robert S. Lewis, Esq. on behalf of H.E. Judson Development Corp.. (Lewis, Robert)
Related: [-]