California Central District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 2:16-cv-00859
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2016
Terminated:Apr 12, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Aug 06, 2016 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
AT and T Inc
Defendant
AT and T Mobility LLC
Represented By
Gleam Olivia Davis
At&t Services
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Mr Le Eldred Palm, Sr
5830 Spahn Avenue
Lakewood, CA 90713
Plaintiff
Le Eldred Palm, Sr
5830 Spahn Avenue
Lakewood, CA 90713


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
15 15 order Dismiss Tue 04/12 4:43 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr that Plaintiff's claims for defamation, negligence, negligent hiring, negligent infliction of emotional distress, intentional infliction of emotional distress, violations of the Universal Declaration of Human Rights, violations of the Unruh Act, and violation of 42 USC section 1981 be, and hereby are, Dismissed with prejudice. Further Ordered that the Ralph Act and Unfair Competition Law claims be, and hereby are, Dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
14 14 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/04 11:02 AM
REPLY Memorandum in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 9 filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility LLC. (Davis, Gleam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/21 3:28 PM
OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Le Eldred Palm, Sr.(Palm, Le Eldred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/21 2:49 PM
OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Le Eldred Palm, Sr.(Palm, Le Eldred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/02 10:52 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Le Eldred Palm, Sr, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gladys - Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Palm, Le Eldred)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 02/29 1:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility LLC, identifying AT&T Mobility LLC; BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc.; AT&T Inc.; SBC Long Distance, LLC; AT&T Teleholdings, Inc.; SBC Tower Holdings LLC; AT&T Capital Services, Inc.; Le'Eldred Palm. (Davis, Gleam)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Mon 02/29 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attorney Gleam Olivia Davis added to party AT and T Mobility LLC(pty:dft)) (Davis, Gleam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of AT&T Mobility, LLCs Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6),
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice Filed in Conjunction with the Motion of AT&T Mobility, LLC to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6),
Att: 3 [Proposed] Order Granting AT&T Mobility, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint
Thursday, February 18, 2016
8 8 order Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O Thu 02/18 11:29 AM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
6 6 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 02/11 4:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER. This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's courtroom deputy clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. (See order for further details). (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2016
7 7 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Fri 02/12 9:35 AM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Le Eldred Palm, Sr. (shb)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 02/09 2:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 02/09 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/09 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Le Eldred Palm, Sr. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/09 2:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant AT and T Inc, AT and T Mobility LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 02/09 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants AT and T Inc, AT and T Mobility LLC, Does 1-10, inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Le Eldred Palm, Sr. (et)
Related: [-]