Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-35284

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Randall L Dunn
Case #: 3:16-ap-03020
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2016
Terminated:May 12, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Crystal Angel Ramirez
15506 SE Division St #21
Portland, OR 97236
Represented By
Crystal Angel Ramirez
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Oregon, Department of Human Services
Represented By
KRISTEN A. GILMAN
Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Saturday, May 14, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 05/14 9:15 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:12 Default Judgment Against Defendant (pjk). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 05/14 9:15 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:11 Order Granting8 Motion For Default Order and Supporting Document(s). filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon, Department of Human Services (pjk). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
12 12 order Judgment Thu 05/12 10:18 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant (pjk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Motion for Default Order Thu 05/12 10:17 AM
Order Granting8 Motion For Default Order and Supporting Document(s). filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon, Department of Human Services (pjk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/12 10:20 AM
Adversary Case 3:16-ap-3020 Closed (pjk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
10 10 misc Bill of Costs Wed 05/11 3:32 PM
Bill of Costs Filed By Plaintiff State of Oregon, Department of Human Services (GILMAN, KRISTEN)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Non-Military Affidavit Wed 05/11 3:28 PM
Non-Military Affidavit Filed By Plaintiff State of Oregon, Department of Human Services (GILMAN, KRISTEN)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Default Order Wed 05/11 3:27 PM
Motion For Default Order and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon, Department of Human Services (GILMAN, KRISTEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Wed 04/20 9:17 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:6 Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 30 Days. Last Date to Comply 5/18/2016, (gjd). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
6 6 order Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Mon 04/18 2:38 PM
Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 30 Days. Last Date to Comply 5/18/2016, (gjd)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held) Mon 04/18 2:37 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held. Re:1 Complaint (gjd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/11 10:58 AM
Summons Served on Crystal Angel Ramirez 2/11/2016 (GILMAN, KRISTEN)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (or Alias) Thu 02/11 10:33 AM
Summons Issued for service on Crystal Angel Ramirez Date Issued 2/11/2016, Answer Due 3/14/20161 Complaint Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 04/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (pjk)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/11 10:26 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 16-03020 rld] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A13982595. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/11 10:25 AM
Adversary case 16-03020 Complaint by State of Oregon, Department of Human Services against Crystal Angel Ramirez Nature of Suit:(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(GILMAN, KRISTEN)
Related: [-]