New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:16-cv-00743
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2016
Re-opened:Mar 01, 2021
Terminated:Mar 04, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2016 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
DAVID R. KOTT
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
ZANE CHRISTIAN RIESTER
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
EDWARD J. FANNING, JR.
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DARLA BRADEN
Represented By
GERALD H. CLARK
Clark Law Firm, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 04, 2021
24 24 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 03/04 3:54 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/4/2021. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 03/03 4:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
22 22 order Order Reopening Case Mon 03/01 7:30 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of its docket. On November 28, 2016, the Court administratively terminated and stayed this matter pending a decision by the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit in Russell v. Croscill Home, LLC . (ECF No.20 .) It appears that the Third Circuit dismissed the Russell appeal on May 16, 2018. Accordingly, the case is hereby reopened. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Bongiovanni to schedule a status conference in this matter. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/1/2021. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
21 21 misc Transcript Thu 02/16 10:15 AM
Transcript of MOTION HEARING held on 11/22/2016, before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Court Reporter- Cathy Ford (609-367-2777). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 3/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2017. (kas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2016
20 20 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Mon 11/28 4:27 PM
ORDER Staying and Administratively Terminating Case pending the decision from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on Russell v. Croscill Home, LLC. 16-1190 Parties shall notify the Court via e-filed correspondence within 7 days of the Third Circuit's decision. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/28/2016. (km)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 11/28 4:28 PM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
19 19 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 11/28 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2016 re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. Ordered case stayed pending a decision from the Third Circuit on Russell v. Croscill Home LLC . Order to be filed. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2016
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/21 5:37 PM
Reset Hearing as to6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Oral Argument on Motion is reset for 11/22/2016 at 01:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5W before Judge Michael A. Shipp. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
18 18 misc Letter Thu 11/10 2:09 PM
Letter from Mark W Morris. (CLARK, GERALD)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/10 3:58 PM
Reset Hearing as to6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Oral Argument on Motion is reset for 11/22/2016 at 02:15 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5W before Judge Michael A. Shipp. (NR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
17 17 order Order Wed 11/09 4:47 PM
TEXT ORDER : Oral argument regarding the pending motion to dismiss, ECF No.6 is scheduled for Tuesday, November 15, 2016, at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 5W. Counsel shall confer regarding their availability for the November 15th oral argument. If there are any conflicts with November 15th, counsel shall e-file correspondence by November 10, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. that provides at least two joint proposed alternative oral argument dates/times from the following dates: Wednesday, November 16; Thursday, November 17; and/or Monday, November 21. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/9/16. (NR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
16 16 misc Letter Tue 10/25 8:24 PM
Letter. (CLARK, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
15 15 misc Letter Mon 10/24 9:26 AM
Letter from David R. Kott to Honorable Michael A. Shipp with enclosure re14 Letter,13 Response (NOT Motion),6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ,11 Response in Support of Motion,9 Brief in Opposition to Motion,10 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
14 14 misc Letter Wed 10/19 1:28 PM
Letter from David R. Kott to Honorable Michael A. Shipp with enclosure re13 Response (NOT Motion),6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ,11 Response in Support of Motion,9 Brief in Opposition to Motion,10 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
13 13 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Thu 09/29 7:28 PM
RESPONSE. (CLARK, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
12 12 order Order Thu 09/22 5:34 PM
TEXT ORDER : Plaintiff may file a response to Defendants' correspondence, ECF No.11 , by September 29, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/22/16. (NR )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
11 11 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 09/21 4:55 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. re6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
10 10 18 pgs respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Tue 05/31 1:32 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. re6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 16, 2016
9 9 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/16 7:29 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by DARLA BRADEN re6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (CLARK, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Brief,
Att: 4 Supplement,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Monday, May 02, 2016
8 8 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Mon 05/02 4:01 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by DARLA BRADEN re6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (CLARK, GERALD)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/02 6:06 PM
Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Motion reset for 6/6/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/15 4:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 04/15 4:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC..(KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification of Zane C. Riester,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Jim Deitzel,
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Jim Deitzel,
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Jim Deitzel,
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Jim Deitzel,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Zane C. Riester,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service,
Att: 10 Letter to Clerk
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Sun 04/17 7:21 PM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Motion set for 5/16/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/04 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ZANE CHRISTIAN RIESTER on behalf of TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. (RIESTER, ZANE)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/04 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. FANNING, JR on behalf of TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. (FANNING, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
3 3 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 03/14 2:35 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney DAVID R. KOTT for TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. added.(KOTT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Filing Letter
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 03/15 9:36 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/15/2016. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/11 2:49 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *PATRICK SEILER* (mps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/11 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against TTI FLOOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6913925) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DARLA BRADEN.(mps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Letter