Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Evelyn J Furse
Case #: 2:16-cv-00120
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2016
Terminated:Mar 25, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 10, 2016 3:41 AM MDT
Defendant
PacifiCorp
Represented By
Calvin R. Winder
Ray Quinney & Nebeker (slc)
contact info
Douglas A. Henderson
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Justin T. Wong
Troutman Sanders
contact info
E. Blaine Rawson
Ray Quinney & Nebeker (slc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Heal Utah
Represented By
Richard Webster
Public Justice PC
contact info
Charles R. Dubuc
Western Resource Advocates
contact info
John Barth
contact info
Plaintiff
Sierra Club
Represented By
Richard Webster
Public Justice PC
contact info
Charles R. Dubuc
Western Resource Advocates
contact info
John Barth
contact info

GPO Mar 22 2019
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Because the Groups have failed to demonstrate the requisite notice to assert their 2016 claim, standing to assert all of their claims, and alternatively because the claims are time-barred, PacifiCorp's Motion for Summary Judgment 57 is GRANTED. Given this ruling, the remaining pending Motions 53 54 56 are DENIED as MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/22/19. (dla)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
101 101 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 07/03 2:25 PM
ORDER denying 91 Defendant's Motion for Attorney and Expert Witness Fees, Motion for Attorney Fees; PacifiCorp's 92 Motion for Protective Order is accordingly DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/2/19. (dla)
Related: [-]