Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:15-bk-52722

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:16-ap-05011
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2016
Terminated:May 20, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Cortland Savings and Banking Company, Defendant
194 W. Main Street
Cortland, OH 44410
Represented By
The Cortland Savings and Banking Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc., Plaintiff
Represented By
Christopher W. Peer
Wickens, Herzer, Panza, Cook & Batista
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc., Plaintiff
Represented By
Christopher W. Peer
Wickens, Herzer, Panza, Cook & Batista
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, May 20, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/20 4:48 PM
Adversary Case 5:16-ap-5011 Closed (kdege)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
court Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI Tue 04/26 8:52 AM
Pretrial set for 4/27/2016 not necessary, notice of dismissal filed--re: document(s):1 Complaint filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc.) (mknot)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/25 4:56 PM
Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc.. (Peer, Christopher aty) Modified on 4/26/2016 (kdege)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Mon 04/25 1:28 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency upon Christopher Peer **PLEASE ADD SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT AT DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS OF RECORD; CORRECTION DUE BY 05/02/2016** Related [+] (kdege)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/25 12:11 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc.. (Peer, Christopher aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Wed 03/23 3:38 PM
Pretrial Resched Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/27/2016 at 03:15 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc.
Thursday, February 18, 2016
4 4 BNC Notice of Order on Pre-Trial Fri 02/19 12:26 AM
Notice of Order on Pre-Trial w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/18/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
3 3 order Relative to Pre-Trial (PDF) Tue 02/16 2:13 PM
Order Relative to Pre-Trial Signed on 2/16/2016 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/30/2016 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 02/16 2:05 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) The Cortland Savings and Banking Company Answer due 3/17/2016. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/30/2016 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] Hearing Set
court Hearing Set Tue 02/16 2:04 PM
Initial Pretrial Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/30/2016 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc.
Friday, February 12, 2016
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/12 5:37 PM
Adversary case 16-05011 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of QSL of Medina, Inc. against The Cortland Savings and Banking Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)),91 (Declaratory Judgement Rule 7001(9)),81 (Subordination of Claim Rule 7001 (10)) (Peer, Christopher aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/12 5:39 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-05011 amk) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33342790. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1