Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Eduardo C Robreno
Case #: 2:16-cv-00508
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2016
Terminated:Jul 28, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jul 30, 2016 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
AMERICAN MEDIA, INC.
Represented By
CAMERON STRACHER
contact info
DINA L. GROVE
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
contact info
DANIEL SEGAL
Hangley Aronchick Segal & Pudlin
contact info
Defendant
ANDREA CONSTAND
Represented By
BEBE H. KIVITZ
Jacobs Kivitz & Drake LLC
contact info
DOLORES M. TROIANI
Troiani & Gibney LLP
contact info
Defendant
BEBE KIVITZ
Represented By
EITAN D. BLANC
Swartz Campbell LLC
contact info
JEFFREY B. MCCARRON
Swartz Campbell & Detweiler
contact info
Defendant
DOLORES M. TROIANI
Represented By
EITAN D. BLANC
Swartz Campbell LLC
contact info
JEFFREY B. MCCARRON
Swartz Campbell & Detweiler
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.
Represented By
SAMUEL W. SILVER
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
JOHN TIMMER
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER TAYBACK
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
JEFFREY L. SCHULMAN
Liner, LLP
contact info
JOSEPH C. SARLES
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
GIANNA CONSTAND
Terminated: 07/15/2016
Represented By
BEBE H. KIVITZ
Jacobs Kivitz & Drake LLC
contact info
DOLORES M. TROIANI
Troiani & Gibney LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 15 2016
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/15/2016. 7/18/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
GPO Jul 15 2016
MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT KIVITZ AND TROIANI'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 32), IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. AMERICAN MEDIA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM (DOC. NO. 39), IS GRANTED. AMERICAN MEDIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 36), IS DENIED. ANDREA AND GIANNA CONSTAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 40), IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AND GIANNA CONSTAND IS THUS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/15/2016. 7/18/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)

1. Bill Cosby case: Entertainer sues accuser Andrea Constand (cnn.com)
Submitted Thu 02/18/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
57 57 misc Transcript - No PDF Tue 08/09 12:14 PM
TRANSCRIPT of HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS held on 7/1/2016 before Judge EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Court Reporter: ESR/MICHAEL T. KEATING, TRANSCRIBERS LIMITED. (amas)
Related: [-]