California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laura S Taylor
Case #: 3:12-bk-03440
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2012
Dismissed:Aug 19, 2013
Terminated:Sep 04, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Knight & Carver Yachtcenter, Inc.
1313 Bay Marina Dr
National City, CA 91950-6303
Represented By
John L. Smaha
Smaha Law Group, Apc
contact info
Gustavo E. Bravo
Smaha Law Group, Aplc
contact info
Last checked: never
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Kristin Mihelic
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2012 5:26 PM PDT
Monday, March 12, 2012
1 1 21 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $ 1046.00. Schedules A-J due 03/26/2012. State. of Fin. Affairs due 03/26/2012. Summary of schedules due 03/26/2012. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities due 03/26/2012. Incomplete Filings due by 03/26/2012, Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/10/2012, Disclosure Statement due by 07/10/2012, Declaration re: ECF due by 03/26/2012, Filed by John L. Smaha of Smaha Law Group, APC on behalf of Knight & Carver Yachtcenter, Inc.. (Smaha, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 12-03440 11) [misc,1031] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 1046.00 Receipt number 7331207. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Knight & Carver Yachtcenter, Inc.. Related [+] (Smaha, John)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
4 4 Receipt of Statement of Social Security Number COURT NOTE: The PDF document is a secured image. filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Knight & Carver Yachtcenter, Inc.. Related [+] (Smaha, John)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition