Helfrich v. State of Nevada et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00312 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
53 | 53
1
pgs
appeal
Order on Mandate
Wed 11/07 2:57 PM
ORDER on Mandate as to51 USCA Mandate, DISMISSING46 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |