California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dale A Drozd
Referred: Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:16-cv-00219
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2016
Terminated:Jun 19, 2020
Last checked: Monday Aug 15, 2016 2:28 AM PDT
Defendant
3Seventy, Inc
Represented By
Matthew R. McCullough
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Garrett Kameichi Sakimae
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Harman-Management Corporation
Represented By
Cameron Cutler
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info
Martin W. Jaszczuk, PHV
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
David L Bird, PHV
Mckay Burton & Thurman, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cory Larson
Represented By
Trinette Gragirena Kent
Kent Law Offices
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2016
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Corresponding Deadlines. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/19/2016, is CONTINUED to 6/28/2016, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 6/21/2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/20/2016. (Timken, A)
GPO Apr 22 2016
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Defendant Harman Management Corporation to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Harman Management Corporation shall file its responsive pleading by no later than May 26, 2016. This extension does not impact or change any event or deadline already set by the Court. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/22/2016. (Timken, A)
GPO Jun 13 2016
ORDER GRANTING 19 Defendant 3Seventy, Inc.'s unopposed motion for a three-week extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant 3Seventy, Inc.'s response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be due on June 30, 2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/2016. (Timken, A)
GPO Jun 20 2016
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Corresponding Deadline. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/28/2016, is CONTINUED to 8/11/2016, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 8/4/2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/20/2019. (Timken, A)
GPO Oct 27 2016
ORDER Denying Defendant's 26 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Dec 19 2016
ORDER REGARDING FILING OF NOICE OF WAIVER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/16/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Notice)(Thorp, J)
GPO Jan 24 2017
ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Proposed Stipulated Protective Order 55. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/24/2017. (Thorp, J)
GPO Feb 01 2017
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/1/2017. (Thorp, J)
GPO Jul 26 2017
ORDER Denying Defendant Harman Management Corporation's 64 Motion to Stay Proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Oct 03 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER to COMPEL RESPONSE TO SUBPOENA BY T-MOBILE USA, INC. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/3/2017. (Timken, A)
GPO Jan 30 2018
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 97 Request to Seal Documents and Motion for Leave to File Redacted Documents, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Jan 30 2018
ORDER Granting 96 Leave to Exceed Page Limits, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Feb 06 2018
ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Defendant Harman Management Corporation's Renewed Motion to Stay Action, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/5/2018. (HMC's ex parte 105 application for an order shortening time is granted, and the hearing for the 108 motion to stay is set for 2/15/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Oppositions to the motion to stay are due by 2/9/2018. HMC's reply, if any, is due by 2/12/2018.)(Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Mar 22 2018
ORDER ON WITHDRAWAL OF RENEWED MOTION TO STAY AND CONTINUING HEARINGS FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT; Motion Hearing currently set for 4/17/2018 is moved to 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/22/2018. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Apr 23 2018
ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/23/2018. (Timken, A)
GPO Jun 29 2018
ORDER Denying Defendant Harman-Management Corporation's 148 Motion to Strike, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/28/2018. (1. Defendant Harman-Management Corporation's motion to strike plaintiffs response to HMC's supplemental authority (Doc. No. 148) is denied; 2. Defendant Harman-Management Corporation is granted leave to file a reply in support of its motion to strike within seven days of this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
GPO Jul 11 2018
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/10/2018. The deadline for the filing dispositive motions is continued to September 28, 2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2018 is CONTINUED to 1/14/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 1/08/2019 is CONTINUED to 3/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Thorp, J)
GPO Sep 11 2018
Order GRANTING joint stipulation to amend scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/11/2018. (Dispositive Motions filed by 11/30/2018; Pretrial Conference currently set for 1/14/2019 has been CONTINUED to 3/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial currently set for 3/12/2019 has been CONTINUED to 5/21/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd )(Rosales, O)
GPO Oct 03 2018
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, 163. The court grants all parties leave to submit additional, simultaneous briefing addressing the Ninth Circuit's recent decision in Marks, not to exceed ten (10) pages in length within fourteen (14) days of the service of this order. The hearing on said motion set for October 23, 2018, is VACATED. Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/2/2018. (Timken, A)
GPO Nov 28 2018
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/28/2018. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Dec 10 2018
ORDER DENYING 167 DEFENDANT HARMAN MANAGEMENT CORPORATIONS RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ACTION signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/10/2018. (Thorp, J)
GPO Jun 13 2019
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to TERMINATE Defendant 3Seventy, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/13/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO Dec 20 2019
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 192 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; ORDERED that the hearing for final approval of the proposed settlement is set for June 15, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 5, with the motion for final approval of class action settlement to be filed twenty-eight (28) days in advance of the final approval hearing, in accordance with Local Rule 230, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/18/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Jun 19 2020
ORDER GRANTING 206 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and AWARDING Attorneys' Fees and Costs and an Incentive Payment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/18/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 19, 2020
210 210 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Certify Class Fri 06/19 12:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING206 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and AWARDING Attorneys' Fees and Costs and an Incentive Payment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/18/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
209 209 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 06/15 3:47 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 6/15/2020.202 Motion for Attorney Fees and206 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiff's Counsel Stephen Taylor telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel David Bird and Martin Jaszczuk telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Thorp, J)
Related: [-]