Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. v. Alvarez-Ayala et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel R Dominguez |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01299 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2016 5:45 AM AST |
Defendant
Luis Ramon Alvarez-Ayala
|
|
Defendant
Elvira De Jesus-Colon
|
|
Defendant
The Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-De Jesus
|
|
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-De Jesus
|
|
Plaintiff
Roosevelt REO PR II Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Fri 03/11 3:24 PM
JUDGMENT. Pursuant to Defendants Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Docket No.4 ) and the Courts Order (Docket No. 5 ) granting Plaintiffs Motion, the Court hereby enters a final judgment DISMISSING THE INSTANT CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/11/2016. (JM) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 03/11 3:18 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/11/2016. (JM) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Thu 02/25 5:11 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Nathalia M. Rivera-Florez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/14/2016 (Rivera-Florez, Nathalia) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/22 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Luis Ramon Alvarez-Ayala, Elvira De Jesus-Colon, The Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-De Jesus (arg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 02/22 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/19 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4795466.), filed by Roosevelt REO PR II Corp.. Service due by 6/23/2016,(Rivera-Florez, Nathalia) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons Luis Alvarez, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons Elvira De Jesus, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons The Conjugal Partnership |