Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 4:12-bk-40944
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Jun 13, 2012
Converted:Apr 11, 2012
Terminated:Aug 12, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Southern Sky Air & Tours, LLC d/b/a Direct Air
1600 N Oak St
Myrtle Beach, SC 29577-3525
Represented By
Alan L. Braunstein
Riemer & Braunstein, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608
Represented By
Richard T. King
United States Trustee
contact info
Trustee
Joseph H. Baldiga
Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee 1800 West Park Drive Suite 400
Westborough, MA 01581
Represented By
Jessica E. Murphy
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee
contact info
Joseph H. Baldiga
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Lougee
contact info
Gina Barbieri O'Neil
Mirick O'Connell
contact info
David J. Reier
Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP
contact info


1. Bankruptcy trustee proposes another deal with one of Myrtle Beach-based Direct Air?s founders (myrtlebeachonline.com)
Submitted Sat 10/25/2014
2. MyrtleBeachOnline.com (myrtlebeachonline.com)
Submitted Mon 06/16/2014
3. MyrtleBeachOnline.com (myrtlebeachonline.com)
Submitted Fri 06/13/2014
Docket last updated: 03/24/2012 9:54 PM EDT
Thursday, March 15, 2012
1 1 7 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition with deficiencies. Filed with Corporate Vote. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1046 Filed by Southern Sky Air & Tours, LLC d/b/a Direct Air. (Braunstein, Alan) Text Modified on 3/16/2012 to reflect documents filed. (mbd, USBC).
Related: [-]