Batavitchene v. Rubin
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Leo T Sorokin |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-10383 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 21, 2016 4:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jeffrey B. Rubin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrone Batavitchene
|
GPO
Mar 31 2016
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered granting 9 Motion to Dismiss and denying 12Motion for ECF Access (Danieli, Chris) |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 11/01 12:04 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Audrone Batavitchene. Appeal16 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Judgment
Wed 10/05 8:01 AM
USCA Judgment as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Audrone Batavitchene. AFFIRMED... (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Filing Fee/Payment Received
Wed 04/20 9:56 AM
Filing fee/payment: $ 505.00, receipt number 1BST055555 (McAlear, Jim) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 04/19 10:03 AM
USCA Case Number 16-1417 for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Audrone Batavitchene. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Mon 04/18 7:25 AM
Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re16 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 04/15 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to13 Order on Motion to Dismiss,14 Order Dismissing Case by Audrone Batavitchene NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at[LINK:http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov] MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 5/5/2016.(Danieli, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Letter from COA | ||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Copy Mailed
Thu 03/31 12:54 PM
Copy re13 Order on Motion to Dismiss,14 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Audrone Batavitchene on 3/31/2016. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/31 12:41 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Danieli, Chris) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 03/31 12:33 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered granting9 Motion to Dismiss and denying12 Motion for ECF Access (Danieli, Chris) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Tue 03/29 2:51 PM
Letter requesting permission to use CM/ECF from Audrone Batavitchene.(Danieli, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
11 | 11
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/29 2:41 PM
Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions filed by Audrone Batavitchene.(Danieli, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit docket sheet | ||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 03/16 1:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions filed by Jeffrey B. Rubin. |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/16 1:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions by Jeffrey B. Rubin. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/09 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeffrey B. Rubin served on 2/24/2016, answer due 3/16/2016.(Montes, Mariliz) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 envelope | ||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 03/07 10:53 AM
Copy of3 Summons Issued, re-sent by first class mail to Plaintiff at Kraziu str. 19-1A LT-01108 Vilnius Lithuania on 3/7/2016. (Montes, Mariliz) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 03/07 10:51 AM
Mail sent to Plaintiff Audrone Batavitchene re.3 : Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (Montes, Mariliz) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee/Payment Received
Tue 02/23 2:46 PM
Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST054470 for1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn) |
|
4 | 4
order
General Order 09-1
Tue 02/23 2:05 PM
General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/23 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Jeffrey B. Rubin. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 02/23 2:05 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/23 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Jeffrey B. Rubin, filed by Audrone Batavitchene.(Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 - 8, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits 9 - 14, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibits 16 - 21, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |