Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Case #: 3:16-cv-00124
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2016
Terminated:Aug 16, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 23, 2016 5:24 AM EDT
Amicus
Communications Workers of America
5153 Poplar Level Road
Louisville, KY 40219
Represented By
Irwin H. Cutler, Jr.
Priddy Cutler Naake & Meade, PLLC
contact info
Robert M. Weaver
Quinn Connor Weaver Davies & Rouco LLP
contact info
Matthew P. Lynch
Priddy Cutler Naake & Meade, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Frontier Communications Corporation
Represented By
Andrea L. R. Nichols
Bingham Greenebaum Doll Llp - Lexington
contact info
John K. Bush
Bingham Greenebaum Doll Llp - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government
Represented By
Tillman L. Lay
Spiegel & Mcdiarmid
contact info
Matthew J. Golden
Jefferson County Attorney
contact info
Peter J. Hopkins
Spiegel & Mcdiarmid
contact info
Plaintiff
BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown Llp - Chicago
contact info
Hans J. Germann
Mayer Brown Llp - Chicago
contact info
Joshua T. Lobert
Mayer Brown Llp - Chicago
contact info
Bethany A. Breetz
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Philip W. Collier
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Christian F. Binnig
Mayer Brown Llp - Chicago
contact info
Douglass C.E. Farnsley
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Mark R. Overstreet
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info

GPO Jul 26 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/26/2016 denying 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction cc: Counsel(KJA)
GPO Aug 16 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/16/2017; Plaintiff AT&T's motion for summary judgment (D.N. 40) is DENIED and Defendant Louisville Metro's motion for summary judgment (D.N. 53) is GRANTED. A separate judgment will be entered this date. cc: Counsel (CDR)
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 28, 2017
93 93 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/29 11:52 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Mark McIntosh re DN 91 and 92. (DAK)
Related: [-]