New York Southern District Court
Judge:Debra C Freeman
Case #: 1:16-cv-01505
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2016
Terminated:Nov 01, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 24, 2016 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Ferrit Cami
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Law Office Of Eli Freedberg P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Imer Cami
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Law Office Of Eli Freedberg P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Larry Cami
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Law Office Of Eli Freedberg P.C.
contact info
Defendant
IFM Contracting Inc.
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Law Office Of Eli Freedberg P.C.
contact info
Defendant
New Land Contracting, Inc.
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Law Office Of Eli Freedberg P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Erik H. Garcia
Represented By
Michael Antonio Faillace
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Raquel Amalia Gutierrez
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Joshua S. Androphy
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Enrique Hernandez
Represented By
Michael Antonio Faillace
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Raquel Amalia Gutierrez
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Joshua S. Androphy
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 01, 2018
35 35 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Fri 11/02 12:35 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED and agreed, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties, that the Complaint and any and all claims that were or could have been asserted in this action against Defendants are hereby dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, disbursements, and attorneys' fees. (The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case on the Docket of the Court.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 11/1/2018) (rj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/30 8:30 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 34 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
34 34 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/29 5:57 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Erik H. Garcia(individually), Enrique Hernandez(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Androphy, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 05/05 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Antonio Faillace on behalf of Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). New Address: Michael Faillace & Associates, PC, 60 east 42nd Street, Suite 4510, New York, NY, United States 10165, 2123171200. (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 05/05 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marisol Santos on behalf of Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). New Address: Michael Faillace & Associates, PC, 60 east 42nd Street, Suite 4510, New York, NY, United States 10165, 2123171200. (Santos, Marisol)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
31 31 order Order Fri 03/10 10:25 AM
ORDER: The Court finds that the terms of the proposed settlement agreement are fair, reasonable, and adequate, both to redress Plaintiffs' claims in this action and to compensate Plaintiffs' counsel for their legal fees, and the agreement is therefore approved, except that, on the parties' consent, paragraph 6 ("Release and Covenant Not to Sue") shall be considered stricken, and replaced with the following language: Plaintiffs hereby irrevocably release and forever discharge Defendants, and any of their affiliates, parent organizations, subsidiaries, directors, managers, employees, agents, representatives, former employees, predecessors, successors, assigns, agents, representatives, descendants, dependents, heirs, executors, administrators, and assigns, from any and all charges, complaints, claims, and liabilities, that were or could have been raised in this action. Nothing in this Agreement shall operate to preclude Plaintiffs from enforcing, or shall adversely affect their rights or abilities to enforce this Agreement. Defendants release and discharge Plaintiffs from any and all charges, complaints, claims, and liabilities, that were or could have been raised in this action. The Court notes that this Order does not incorporate the terms of the parties' proposed agreement. Further, the settlement agreement does not recite that this Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce its terms, and this Court has made no independent determination to retain jurisdiction. Accordingly, nothing in this Court's approval of the settlement under Cheeks should be construed as such a determination. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 359-60 (2d Cir. 2015) (finding that a federal court will retain ancillary jurisdiction to enforce a settlement only where it has (1) expressly retained jurisdiction over enforcement of the agreement, or (2) incorporated the terms of the parties' settlement agreement in a court order); see also Mao v. Mee Chi Corp., No. 15cv1799 JCF), 2016 WL 6754342, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. F eh. 11, 2016) (finding no retention of jurisdiction in the context of judicial approval of an FLSA settlement, on the ground that "[i]t is not enough that the court somehow have given the settlement its 'judicial imprimatur'" (citing Hendrickson, 791 F.3d at 358-59)). By their initial letter, Plaintiffs have requested that this Court approve the settlement, and dismiss the case with prejudice only after Plaintiffs have filed a stipulation of dismissal with the Court. (See Dkt. 29, at 1.) Accordingly, Plaintiffs are hereby directed to submit a stipulation of dismissal, in accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement, as modified herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 3/10/207) (mro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
30 30 misc Letter Mon 02/06 11:21 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Marisol Santos dated 2/6/17 re: proposed changes to release. Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually).(Santos, Marisol)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
29 29 misc Settlement Agreement Wed 12/14 4:33 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT & letter regarding fairness . Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually).(Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 10/11 4:55 PM
Minute Entry The Pretrial Conference previously set for 10/20/2016 is adjourned sine die. (Lopez, Jose)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2016
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 10/08 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marisol Santos on behalf of Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Santos, Marisol)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
27 27 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 07/26 6:17 PM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ferrit Cami, Imer Cami, Larry Cami, Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually), IFM Contracting Inc., New Land Contracting, Inc. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/26/2016) (tn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 07/15 4:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Settlement Conference held on 7/14/2016. (aba)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/01 4:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Telephone Conference held via telephone on 7/1/2016, ( Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman). (aba)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2016
26 26 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 06/17 4:06 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Freeman to schedule a settlement conference in or about the next 45 days. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/17/2016) (tn)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Case Management Plan Fri 06/17 4:01 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 10/14/2016. Depositions due by 10/14/2016. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is one to two days. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/17/2016) (tn)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 06/21 9:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/17/2016. (Court Reporter Ellen Simone) (Lopez, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/10 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raquel Amalia Gutierrez on behalf of Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Gutierrez, Raquel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/07 1:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ferrit Cami, Imer Cami, Larry Cami, IFM Contracting Inc., New Land Contracting, Inc..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/07 12:58 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by IFM Contracting Inc., New Land Contracting, Inc..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
21 21 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/26 9:21 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJOURNING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned counsel that the time within which Defendants New Land Contracting, Inc. (d/b/a New Land Contracting), IFM Contracting Inc., (d/b/a New Land Contracting), Lany Cami, Imer Cami and Ferrit Cami may answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is hereby extended to June 7, 2016. It is further stipulated and agreed that Defendants waive all defenses relating to personal jurisdiction and sufficiency of service of process. The initial pretrial conference in this matter, previously set for June 2, 2016, will be adjourned to June 17, 2016, at 3:30 p.m. The parties are directed to docket entry 14 for the requirements for the parties' pre-conference submissions. So ordered. Ferrit Cami answer due 6/7/2016; Imer Cami answer due 6/7/2016; Larry Cami answer due 6/7/2016; IFM Contracting Inc. answer due 6/7/2016; New Land Contracting, Inc. answer due 6/7/2016. (Initial Conference set for 6/17/2016 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/25/2016) (rjm)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/25 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eli Zev Freedberg on behalf of Ferrit Cami, Imer Cami, Larry Cami, IFM Contracting Inc., New Land Contracting, Inc.. (Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/06 10:57 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ferrit Cami served on 3/10/2016, answer due 3/31/2016. Service was accepted by Ms. Sylvia, Co-worker. Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Erik H. Garcia(individually); Enrique Hernandez(individually); Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/06 10:16 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Imer Cami served on 3/10/2016, answer due 3/31/2016. Service was accepted by Ms. Sylvia, Co-worker. Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Erik H. Garcia(individually); Enrique Hernandez(individually); Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/06 10:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Larry Cami served on 3/10/2016, answer due 3/31/2016. Service was accepted by Ms. Sylvia, Co-worker. Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Erik H. Garcia(individually); Enrique Hernandez(individually); Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/06 9:45 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New Land Contracting, Inc. served on 3/3/2016, answer due 3/24/2016. Service was accepted by Chad Matice, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Erik H. Garcia(individually); Enrique Hernandez(individually); Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 04/05 6:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. IFM Contracting Inc. served on 3/3/2016, answer due 3/24/2016. Service was accepted by Chad Matice, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Erik H. Garcia(individually); Enrique Hernandez(individually); Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
14 14 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 03/09 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/2/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/9/2016) (cf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/01 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua S. Androphy on behalf of Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Androphy, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
12 12 service Summons Issued Mon 02/29 4:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ferrit Cami. (pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 02/29 4:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Imer Cami. (pc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 02/29 4:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to IFM Contracting Inc.. (pc)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 02/29 4:56 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Land Contracting, Inc.. (pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 02/29 4:56 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Larry Cami. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 02/29 2:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216(b). (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 02/29 2:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 02/29 2:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 02/29 2:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2016
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/26 3:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ferrit Cami, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/26 3:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Imer Cami, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/26 3:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IFM Contracting, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/26 3:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Land Contracting, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/26 3:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Larry Cami, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erik H. Garcia(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Enrique Hernandez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/26 3:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/26 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Ferrit Cami, Imer Cami, Larry Cami, IFM Contracting Inc., New Land Contracting, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12004289)Document filed by Enrique Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Erik H. Garcia(individually), Enrique Hernandez(individually), Erik H. Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]