Pediatric Bioscience, Inc.
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laura S Taylor |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-01185 |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2020 |
Debtor
Pediatric Bioscience, Inc.
10581 Roselle St Ste 115
San Diego, CA 92121-1521 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Gerald H. Davis
P.O. Box 124640
San Diego, CA 92112 |
Represented By
|
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 03/02/2016 3:12 PM PST |
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 335.00. Declaration re: ECF due by 03/16/2016, Filed by Alan Vanderhoff of Vanderhoff Law Group on behalf of Pediatric Bioscience, Inc.. (Vanderhoff, Alan) | |
2 | 2 Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 16-01185 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 335.00 Receipt number A12126402 ; (U.S. Treasury) | |
3 | 3 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Gerald H. Davis, 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/31/2016 at 11:00 AM at 402 W. Broadway, Emerald Plaza Building, Suite 660 (A), Hearing Room A, San Diego, CA 92101 (Ch7). (Vanderhoff, Alan) | |
4 | 4 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Alan Vanderhoff on behalf of Pediatric Bioscience, Inc.. (Vanderhoff, Alan) | |
5 | 5 Notice of Failure to Comply with Filing Requirements You must correct the defect no later than 10:00a.m. on 03/03/2016 or your case may be dismissed without further notice. File a list containing the name and address of each entity included or to be included on Schedules D-H. Misc. Tickler Due Date: 3/3/2016, (Paluso, R.) |