Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc. v. CNR Products, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywell |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-00479 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2016 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
CNR Products, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Amended Order
Fri 08/12 3:09 PM
AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. This Consent Judgment is amended to correct a typographical error in Paragraph 7 of the Judgment. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/12/2016. (BGS) |
|
16 | 16
order
Judgment - consent
Fri 08/12 1:11 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Defendant, its successors or assigns, their respective officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys and any and all persons in active concert or participating with them who receive actual notice of this Order, by personal service or otherwise, are permanently restrained and enjoined from causing, aiding or abetting any of the following for the life of the '310 patent: Making, having made, using, selling, offering to sell, importing or distributing of the accused product, or any other product which infringes Plaintiff's '310 patent, unless specifically authorized in writing by Plaintiff. Defendant is ordered to destroy all remaining inventory of the accused product within 30 days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/12/2016. (BGS) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Fri 07/22 11:05 AM
Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc..(okotilow, Manny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent judgment - proposed
Mon 06/27 3:25 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc.. (Cherry, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of service executed
Wed 05/25 12:31 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 05 24-2016 by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc. as to CNR Products, Inc.. (Cherry, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Compliance notice
Thu 03/17 1:32 PM
NOTICE of compliance by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc. (Cherry, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Wed 03/16 2:06 PM
ORDER granting 10 motion for Manny D. Pokotilow to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/15/2016. (DMS) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 03/11 11:32 AM
MOTION for Manny D. Pokotilow to appear pro hac vice by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc..(Cherry, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance of non-resident counsel
Fri 03/11 11:29 AM
APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Douglas Anthony Cherry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Local Counsel: Douglas A. Cherry and J. Todd Timmerman. Non-Resident Counsel: Manny D. Pokotilow. (Cherry, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Thu 03/10 12:43 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney MANNY D POKOTILOW, appearing on behalf of Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA035419.). (JEQ) |
||
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 03/08 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc.. (Cherry, Douglas) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 03/08 1:56 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Cherry, Douglas) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 03/08 1:51 PM
MOTION for Manny D. Pokotilow to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs.(Cherry, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Interested persons order
Thu 03/03 11:54 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/17/2016. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/3/2016. (WMD) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Thu 03/03 11:53 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 - Patent. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/17/2016. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/3/2016. (WMD) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/02 5:05 PM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (EJC) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Wed 03/02 5:01 PM
Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (EJC) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/02 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against CNR Products, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number TPA-35228) filed by Tervis Tumbler Company, Inc..(EJC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |