Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas O Rice
Case #: 1:16-cv-03030
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2016
Terminated:Oct 10, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 30, 2016 2:39 AM PDT
Amicus
Attorney General of Washington
800 Fifth Avenue Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Patricio A Marquez
Office Of The Attorney General-Sea
contact info
Defendant
City of Yakima
Represented By
Kenneth W Harper
Menke Jackson Beyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yakima Neighborhood Health Services
Represented By
Ian S Morrison
Mccullough Hill Leary Ps
contact info
G Richard Hill
Mccullough Hill Leary Ps
contact info

GPO Jul 22 2016
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Parties Stipulated Protective Order ECF No. 15 is APPROVED and shall govern this proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
GPO Oct 10 2017
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the parties stipulation 46, all claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or attorneys fees to any party. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)

1. Neighborhood Health suit moves to federal court (yakimaherald.com)
Submitted Mon 03/14/2016
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
48 48 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/10 8:23 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the parties stipulation46 , all claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or attorneys fees to any party. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2017
47 47 misc Stipulation Mon 10/09 3:02 PM
STIPULATION re46 Stipulation of Dismissal Agreed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice [Proposed] by City of Yakima. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
46 46 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/09 2:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by City of Yakima. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
45 45 misc Status Report Wed 07/26 11:11 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by All Defendants. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
44 44 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/05 11:34 AM
ORDER: Absent the filing of a stipulated motion to dismiss, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 8/3/2017 , informing the Court of the expected date upon which final settlement will be reached. Signed Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT.(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
43 43 misc Status Report Mon 04/03 11:45 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services and City of Yakima . (Hill, G) Modified on 4/3/2017 to correct filer information. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
42 42 order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Expedite Fri 10/07 7:51 AM
ORDER granting40 Stipulated Motion to Stay and41 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
41 41 motion Expedite Tue 10/04 12:02 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Expedite Hearing Re: Stipulation and Motion to Stay Proceedings by City of Yakima. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
40 40 motion Stay Thu 09/22 2:54 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings by City of Yakima. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
39 39 notice Notice of Cancellation - By Court Wed 09/14 8:36 AM
NOTICE of Cancellation - By Court: At the request of the parties, the hearing on Defendant's17 Motion for Summary Judgment set for 9/15/2016 is stricken from the Court's calendar. Counsel are directed to contact the Court should it become necessary to re-note the motion for hearing. TEXT ONLY NOTICE; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
38 38 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/07 10:42 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Expedite Request for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by City of Yakima.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1,
Att: 2 Appendix 2,
Att: 3 Appendix 3
Thursday, September 01, 2016
37 37 motion Expedite Thu 09/01 3:15 PM
First MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Hill, G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion Hearing Thu 09/01 9:46 AM
Reset Motion Hearing as to35 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations. Hearing reset to 9/29/2016 without oral argument (pursuant to Local Rule) before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
36 36 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 08/30 4:58 PM
DECLARATION by G. Richard Hill in Support re35 First MOTION to Expedite filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Expedite Tue 08/30 4:57 PM
First MOTION to Expedite by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 29, 2016
34 34 respm Statement of Facts Mon 08/29 2:42 PM
STATEMENT OF Defendant's Reply Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment FACTS re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Yakima. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Reply Memorandum Mon 08/29 2:38 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Summary Judgment Reply Brief filed by City of Yakima. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2016
32 32 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/23 10:19 AM
AMENDMENT TO BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
31 31 order Order on Motion to Expedite Mon 08/22 11:00 AM
ORDER re24 Motion to Expedite Request for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Attorney General of Washington State. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2016
30 30 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/15 3:52 PM
DECLARATION by Kevin Cahill in Opposition re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/15 3:51 PM
DECLARATION by Morgan Shook in Opposition re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/15 3:50 PM
DECLARATION by Anita Monoian in Opposition re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/15 3:50 PM
DECLARATION by G. Richard Hill in Opposition re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services.(Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit a-b,
Att: 2 Exhibit c,
Att: 3 Exhibit d-h,
Att: 4 Exhibit i-n
26 26 respm Statement of Facts Mon 08/15 3:47 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response to Motion Mon 08/15 3:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 at 10:30 AM Spokane before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Morrison, Ian)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Expedite Mon 08/15 2:51 PM
MOTION to Expedite Request for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Attorney General of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Marquez, Patricio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
23 23 motion Amend/Correct Wed 08/10 2:03 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct Bench Trial Scheduling Order by City of Yakima. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2016
22 22 notice Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Tue 08/02 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services (Hill, G)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2016
21 21 misc Praecipe Mon 07/25 4:49 PM
Praecipe filed by City of Yakima: Re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Description: incorrect reference to ECF filing number in document. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/25 4:40 PM
DECLARATION by Kenneth W. Harper in Support re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Yakima.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
19 19 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/25 4:35 PM
DECLARATION by Jeff Peters in Support re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Yakima.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z,
Att: 27 Exhibit AA,
Att: 28 Exhibit AB,
Att: 29 Exhibit AC,
Att: 30 Exhibit AD
18 18 respm Statement of Facts Mon 07/25 4:24 PM
STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Yakima. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Mon 07/25 4:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Yakima. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 at 10:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Harper, Kenneth) Modified on 7/25/2016 to correct location(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 07/22 10:17 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Parties Stipulated Protective Order ECF No.15 is APPROVED and shall govern this proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
15 15 motion Protective Order Fri 07/15 4:08 PM
First MOTION for Protective Order by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hill, G)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Hearing Fri 07/15 4:36 PM
Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to15 First MOTION for Protective Order . Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2016 without oral argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
14 14 notice Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Wed 06/29 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by City of Yakima (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
13 13 misc Praecipe Tue 04/19 2:40 PM
Praecipe filed by City of Yakima: Re12 Notice (Other). Description: Did not include Exhibits A and B.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
12 12 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/19 2:09 PM
NOTICE by City of Yakima of Intent to Serve Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information or Objects (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/14 3:13 PM
BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:A Telephonic Pretrial Conference is set for 2/2/2017 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. A Bench Trial is set for 2/13/2017 at 9:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 04/14 10:07 AM
Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice: Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2016. Related [+] (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-] ported by: Mark A. Snover
Thursday, March 31, 2016
8 8 misc Status Report Thu 03/31 4:25 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference by City of Yakima. (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2016
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/28 3:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Yakima.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
6 6 notice Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Tue 03/15 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by City of Yakima (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
5 5 notice Scheduling Conference Notice Mon 03/14 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2016 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
4 4 cmp Complaint - Amended Thu 03/10 4:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Yakima. Filed by Yakima Neighborhood Health Services.(Hill, G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Corp Disclosure
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/10 10:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by City of Yakima.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2016
2 2 notice Notice - Other Thu 03/03 11:27 AM
NOTICE by City of Yakima To Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/03 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-2282354 Filed by City of Yakima.(Harper, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 03/03 11:32 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]