Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:16-cr-00436
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2016
Terminated:Jun 24, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Dec 07, 2017 5:05 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christina Vejar
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Brian Antonio Hernandez-Salomon (1)
Terminated: 06/24/2016
Represented By
Stephen Jonathan Young
Law Offices Of Williamson & Young PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2024 10:39 PM MST
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
Arrest of Brian Antonio Hernandez on 2/3/2016. (ADI-SGF, ) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Brian Antonio Hernandez. (ADI-SGF, ) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Brian Antonio Hernandez held on 2/4/2016. Appointing Stephen Jonathan Young for defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendants temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath (duty) for the Government, CJA Attorney S. Jonathan Young for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 2/8/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Related [+] Hearing held 2:14 to 2:44. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMJ) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Monday, February 08, 2016
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle: Status Conference as to Brian Antonio Hernandez held on 2/8/2016. Defendant states TRUE NAME to be Brian Antonio Hernandez-Salomon. Further proceedings ordered in defendant's true name. This matter is to be continued at the date below. Jonathan Young, defense counsel can make an argument to see if release conditions can be set at that time. Defendant is set for bag and baggage to that hearing, if released. Added attorney Christina Vejar for USA. Appearances : AUSA Angela Woolridge for Christina Vejar for the Government, CJA Attorney Peter Raptis for Jonathan Young for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention/Preliminary Hearings are CONTINUED to 2/11/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Related [+] Hearing held 11:32 AM to 11:52 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Thursday, February 11, 2016
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle: Detention Hearing as to Brian Antonio Salomon-Hernandez held on 2/11/2016. Defendant ordered released on Own Recognizance.Conditions of Release to follow. Defendant is temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshals until scheduled Release Hearing. Pretrial Services to evaluate and set up for electronic location monitoring. Defendant to be transported Bag and Baggage. Defendant states true name to be the same. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bowman. Appearances : AUSA Lauren LaBuff for Christina Vejar for the Government, CJA Attorney Jonathan Young for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Release Hearing set for 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Related [+] Hearing held 10:39 AM to 11:44 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MLH) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco: Release Hearing as to Brian Antonio Salomon-Hernandez held on 2/16/2016. Defendant ordered released on conditions of release as previously ordered by Magistrate Judge Pyle with the additional condition that he reside at a halfway house. Appearances : AUSA Not present for the Government, CJA Attorney S. Jonathan Young for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Related [+] Hearing held 10:14 to 10:15. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMJ) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Brian Antonio Salomon-Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 2/11/2016.(SMJ) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
9 9 NOTICE of Intent to Destroy Contraband by USA as to Brian Antonio Salomon-Hernandez. (Vejar, Christina) [4:16-mj-01464-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
10 10 INDICTMENT as to Brian Antonio Salomon-Hernandez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. Counsel is advised as to Arraignment set for 3/18/2016 @ 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G. Macdonald. TRIAL date is 4/26/2016 @ 9:30 AM, PLEA DEADLINE set 4/8/2016. NOTE: Notice of Intent to waive Defendant's Presence at Arraignment shall be filed not later than Tuesday prior to arraignment. (KEP)
Related: [-]