KONYO v. NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Madeline C Arleo |
Referred: | Steven C Mannion |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01205 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2016 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABC CORP. 1-50
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-50
|
|
Defendant
NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ORLY KONYO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference Settlement Conference
Wed 06/29 10:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2016, Settlement Conference held on 6/28/2016. Settlement placed on record (CD #ECR.) (spc, ) |
||
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 06/17 4:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 6/16/2016. Settlement discussions held (spc, ) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Fri 06/10 10:01 AM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 6/16/2016 at 4:15 PM. Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/10/16. (SCM) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 06/13 10:10 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2016. text order entered (spc, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 06/01 11:59 PM
Letter from Lawrence Hersh to Judge Cox Arleo re12 Letter. (HERSH, LAWRENCE) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Wed 06/01 11:14 AM
Letter from Bruce S. Luckman to Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo re11 Letter,10 Order Dismissing Case,. (LUCKMAN, BRUCE) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 05/31 5:09 PM
Letter from Lawrence Hersh, Esq. to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo re10 Order Dismissing Case,. (HERSH, LAWRENCE) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/31 4:20 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days to reopen if the settlement is not consummated. The Clerk shall close the file in this matter. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 5/11/2016. (JB, ) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 05/27 12:21 PM
TEXT ORDER: The R16 conference will be held on 6/9/2016 in Courtroom 2B at 4:00 P.M. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/27/16. (SCM) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Thu 05/26 2:48 PM
Letter from Lawrence Hersh, Esq. to the Hon. Steven C. Mannion re7 Letter. (HERSH, LAWRENCE) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 05/10 4:35 PM
Letter from Lawrence Hersh to Judge Mannion. (HERSH, LAWRENCE) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/30 2:46 PM
ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 5/13/2016 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 3/30/2016. (spc, ) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 03/17 3:11 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 03/17/2016. (ek) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/09 3:48 PM
Defendant, Nationwide Credit, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC..(LUCKMAN, BRUCE) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/09 3:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC. identifying altisource portfolio solutions as Corporate Parent.. (LUCKMAN, BRUCE) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/04 1:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC. identifying that this party does not have a parent corporation, etc. (jr) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/04 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC. from Superior Court, Law Division, Special Civil Part: Bergen County, case number DC-01505-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6955045), filed by NATIONWIDE CREDIT, INC..(jr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |