Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Paul D Borman
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:16-cv-10796
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2016
Re-opened:May 03, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2016 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Glasgow
Represented By
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Michigan, State of
Represented By
Zachary C. Larsen
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Richard S. Kuhl
Assistant Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Liane Smith
Represented By
Thaddeus E. Morgan
Fraser, Trebilcock,
contact info
Michael H. Perry
Fraser, Trebilcock,
contact info
Defendant
Michael Prysby
Represented By
Charles E. Barbieri
Foster, Swift,
contact info
Allison M. Collins
Foster, Swift, Collins & Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lockwood, Andrews & Newman, P.C.
Represented By
Philip A. Erickson
Plunkett & Cooney
contact info
David C. Kent
Sedgwick LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lockwood, Andrews & Newman, Inc.
Represented By
Philip A. Erickson
Plunkett & Cooney
contact info
David C. Kent
Sedgwick LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dayne Walling
Represented By
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Leo A. Daly Company
Represented By
Philip A. Erickson
Plunkett & Cooney
contact info
David C. Kent
Sedgwick LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bradley Wurfel
Represented By
Jordan S. Bolton
Clark Hill
contact info
Christopher B. Clare
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Jay M. Berger
Clark Hill (detroit)
contact info
Michael J. Pattwell
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Wyant
Represented By
Jordan S. Bolton
Clark Hill
contact info
Christopher B. Clare
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Jay M. Berger
Clark Hill (detroit)
contact info
Michael J. Pattwell
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Defendant
RICHARD D. SNYDER
Represented By
Zachary C. Larsen
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Todd R. Mendel
Barris, Sott,
contact info
Eugene Driker
Barris, Sott,
contact info
Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Richard S. Kuhl
Assistant Attorney General
contact info
Morley Witus
Barris, Sott, Denn & Driker, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Daugherty Johnson
Represented By
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Edward Kurtz
Defendant
Michigan Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By
Zachary C. Larsen
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Veolia Environnement SA
Defendant
Darnell Earley
Represented By
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Howard Croft
Represented By
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Cook
Represented By
Charles E. Barbieri
Foster, Swift,
contact info
Allison M. Collins
Foster, Swift, Collins & Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
City of Flint, a municipal corporation
Represented By
Frederick A. Berg
Butzel Long
contact info
Sheldon H. Klein
Butzel Long
contact info
Stacy Erwin Oakes
City Of Flint
contact info
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Busch
Represented By
Courtney B. Ciullo
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Dennis K. Egan
Kotz, Sangster, Wysocki & Berg, P.C.
contact info
Krista A. Jackson
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Philip A. Grashoff, Jr.
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Veolia North America, Inc.
Defendant
Gerald Ambrose
Represented By
William Young Kim
City Of Flint
contact info
Defendant
Veolia North America, LLC
Defendant
Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC
Defendant
Adam Rosenthal
Represented By
Charles E. Barbieri
Foster, Swift,
contact info
Allison M. Collins
Foster, Swift, Collins & Smith, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
TL
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiesha Tipton
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Mathes
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SE
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RE
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AS
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AT
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amber Brown
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Fetterman
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Funches
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JM
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KD
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KE
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KM
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Lightfoot
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MT
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Myia McMillian
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PA
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SAM
Represented By
Hunter Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik Law PLLC
contact info
David J. Shea
Shea Aiello, PLLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 12, 2017
143 143 order Reassignment/Disqualification Fri 05/12 2:03 PM
ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge John Corbett O'Meara in Ann Arbor to District Judge Paul D. Borman in Detroit. (SSch)
Related: [-]