Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Clarence Cooper
Case #: 1:16-cv-00708
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2016
Terminated:May 05, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2016 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Coosa Cable Company, Inc.
Defendant
USA Communications, LLC
Represented By
Robert C. Khayat, Jr.
The Khayat Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Rayvion LLC
Represented By
Adam Scott Katz
Katz Litigation Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 05, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/05 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Rayvion LLC (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 05/05 1:31 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (bjh)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/05 1:31 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Wed 04/27 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re16 Amended Complaint,, Corrected by Rayvion LLC.(Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/27 3:42 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Rayvion LLC.(Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit F to Amended Complaint
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 04/20 2:08 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint to properly allege the citizenship of each member of Plaintiff Rayvion LLC and each member of Defendant USA Communications, LLC by April 27, 2016. Defendant USA Communications, LLC should cooperate with Plaintiff in determining the citizenship of each of its members. Any failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/20/16. (jta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/19 3:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by USA Communications, LLC. (Khayat, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
13 13 service Return of Service Executed Fri 04/15 11:37 AM
Return of Service Executed by Rayvion LLC. Coosa Cable Company, Inc. served on 4/10/2016, answer due 5/2/2016. (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
12 12 service Return of Service Executed Mon 04/11 1:20 PM
Return of Service Executed by Rayvion LLC. USA Communications, LLC served on 3/29/2016, answer due 4/19/2016. (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/11 11:19 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Coosa Cable Company, Inc., c/o Jeffrey T. Smith, President @ 155 Circle Dr NE, Pell City, Alabama. (bjh)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/11 11:18 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Coosa Cable Company, Inc., c/o Arthur M. Smith, Incorporator @ 1701 Cogswell Ave, Pell City, Alabama. (bjh)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/11 11:17 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Coosa Cable Company, Inc., c/o Jeffrey T. Smith, President @ 1701 Cogswell Ave, Pell City, Alabama. (bjh)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/11 11:15 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to USA Communications, LLC. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
7 7 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/10 11:23 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Rayvion LLC for Coosa Cable Company, Inc. (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/10 11:18 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Rayvion LLC for Coosa Cable Company, Inc. (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/10 11:16 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Rayvion LLC for Coosa Cable Company, Inc. (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/10 11:16 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Rayvion LLC for Coosa Cable Company, Inc. (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/10 11:15 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Rayvion LLC for USA Communications, LLC (Katz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2016
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 03/07 1:40 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rayvion LLC. (bnw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/07 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rayvion LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6327038.)(bnw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet