PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00454 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 04, 2016 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 07/12 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint stipulation of dismissal26 , this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/12/2017. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/11 11:33 AM
STIPULATION (Joint) of Settlement and Dismissal by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP. (Rosenbaum, Adina) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 06/07 3:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP (Rosenbaum, Adina) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 06/07 6:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time25 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before July 12, 2017; that defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before August 3, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before August 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/7/2017. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 06/09 3:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 7/12/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 8/3/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/24/2017. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/12/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/3/2017. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 05/10 11:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time24 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before June 12, 2017; that defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before July 3, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before July 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/10/17. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/10 11:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment due on or before 6/12/2017; Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment due on or before 7/3/2017; Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before 7/24/2017. (kt) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 05/09 4:13 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP (Rosenbaum, Adina) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 04/14 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP. Attorney Rachel M. Clattenburg terminated. (Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 04/07 3:00 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Sroka, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts Not In Genuine Dispute, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Michael Marquis with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Michael Lauer, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Jeffrey Drazen with Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Howard Bauchner, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration of Lewis First, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration of David Bull with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 9 Declaration of Luke Verillo with Exhibits | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 03/22 12:58 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify the Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Sroka, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 03/22 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time21 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before April 7, 2017; that plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before May 12, 2017; that defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before June 2, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before June 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2017. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/22 2:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 4/7/2017; Plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 5/12/2017; Defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 6/2/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 6/23/2017. (kt) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 03/06 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Alexander K. Haas (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 02/24 9:06 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 3/24/2017; Plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 4/28/2017; Defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 5/19/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 6/9/2017. (kt) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 02/23 6:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Regarding the Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Haas, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Thu 02/23 7:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time19 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before March 24, 2017; that plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before April 28, 2017; that defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before May 19, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/23/2017. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/24 11:36 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 3/3/2017; Plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 4/7/2017; Defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 4/28/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 5/19/2017. (kt) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 01/23 5:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to Modify the Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Haas, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 01/23 6:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time18 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before March 3, 2017; that plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before April 7, 2017; that defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before April 28, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/2017. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 01/17 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander Kenneth Haas on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Carl E. Ross (Haas, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/03 9:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 1/27/2017; Plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 3/2/2017; Defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 3/23/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 4/13/2017. (kt) |
||
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 12/30 11:47 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Ross, Carl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 12/30 6:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's consent motion for an extension of time, the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before January 27, 2017; that plaintiff may file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before March 2, 2017; that defendant may file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before March 23, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/30/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 12/07 10:05 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 1/3/2017; Plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 2/7/2017; Defendant may file an opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 2/28/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/21/2017. (kt) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 12/06 3:24 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Ross, Carl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 12/06 6:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time15 , the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before January 3, 2017; that plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before February 7, 2017; that defendant may file an opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before February 28, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/6/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 11/09 12:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time14 , the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before December 6, 2016; that plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before January 12, 2017; that defendant may file an opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before February 2, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before February 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/9/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/09 2:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 12/6/2016; Plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 1/12/2017; Defendant may file an opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 2/2/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 2/23/2017. (kt) |
||
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 11/03 6:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Ross, Carl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/11 8:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may submit its motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index on or before 11/4/2016; Plaintiff may submit its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 12/5/2016; Defendant may submit a combined opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 1/12/2017; Plaintiff may submit its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 1/27/2017. (kt) |
||
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Modify
Mon 10/10 3:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint motion to modify the briefing schedule13 , the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may submit its motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index on or before November 4, 2016; plaintiff may submit its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before December 5, 2016; defendant may submit a combined opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before January 12, 2017; and plaintiff may submit its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before January 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/10/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Modify
Fri 10/07 11:41 AM
Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP(Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/07 8:48 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may submit its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before 11/4/2016. (kt) |
||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 10/06 11:56 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Ross, Carl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 10/06 8:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's consent motion for an extension of time12 , the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant may submit its Vaughn index and motion for summary judgment on or before November 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/6/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/03 1:23 PM
NOTICE to the Court by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Borum, Marian) |
|
order
.Order
Tue 05/03 2:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's notice11 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties comply with the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendant shall produce all responsive records to Plaintiff on or before August 31, 2016. (2) Defendant shall file a Vaughn index and may file a motion for summary judgment on or before October 14, 2016. (3) Plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before November 14, 2016. (4) Defendant may file a combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before December 14, 2016. (5) Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before December 30, 2016. If the parties wish to modify the briefing schedule after Defendant's production of responsive records, they may file a joint motion to that effect. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/3/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/03 3:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall produce all responsive records to Plaintiff on or before 8/31/2016; Defendant shall file a Vaughn index and may file a motion for summary judgment on or before 10/14/2016; Plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 11/14/2016; Defendant may file a combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before 12/14/2016; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 12/30/2016. (kt) |
||
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 04/29 10:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 4/29/2016. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) |
||
order
.Order
Fri 04/29 10:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the April 29, 2016 status conference, Defendant shall notify the Court on or before May 4, 2016, whether the schedule for production and briefing discussed during the status conference, in which Defendant will produce all responsive records by August 31, 2016, is acceptable to Defendant, or whether Defendant would prefer briefing to take place in two stages. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/29/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/29 11:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall notify the Court on or before 5/4/2016 whether the schedule for production and briefing discussed during the status conference, in which Defendant will produce all responsive records by 8/31/2016, is acceptable to Defendant. (kt) |
||
Tuesday, April 12, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/12 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adina Rosenbaum on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP (Rosenbaum, Adina) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue
Mon 04/11 2:22 PM
MOTION to Continue Status Conference by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP(Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 04/11 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to continue the status conference9 is hereby GRANTED. The status conference currently scheduled for April 18, 2016, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for April 29, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/11/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/11 3:17 PM
Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 4/29/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) |
||
Saturday, April 09, 2016 | ||
order
.Order
Sat 04/09 5:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a status conference on April 18, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/9/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/08 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Borum, Marian) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Tue 03/22 9:50 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/15/2016.(Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/15 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marian L. Borum on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Borum, Marian) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 03/10 11:07 AM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP (Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Wed 03/09 2:22 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/9/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2016. (Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
3 | 3
order
.Order
Wed 03/09 11:48 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties shall comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/9/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 03/09 11:29 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(jd) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/08 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4440142) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP.(Clattenburg, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/09 11:09 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) |