Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert C Mitchell
Case #: 2:16-cv-00291
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2016
Terminated:Jul 27, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2016 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL
Represented By
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
CHAMINE PHILLIPS
Represented By
Jerome J. Kaharick
Jerome J. Kaharick & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
BRAD SNYDER
Terminated: 08/18/2016
Represented By
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 16, 2017
41 41 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 10/16 11:10 AM
ORDER granting40 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/16/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
40 40 motion Dismiss Fri 10/13 3:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary Dismissal by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
39 39 order Statistical Case Closing Thu 07/27 2:16 PM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 7/27/2017. (awb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
38 38 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/11 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference previously set for 8/1/2017 10:00 AM is reset for 8/4/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. (spc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
37 37 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/02 1:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Status Conference held on 5/2/2017. Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Status Conference set for 8/1/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. (Court Reporter: none) (spc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
36 36 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/25 1:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Settlement Conference held on 1/25/2017. Case did not settle. 1. Discovery due by 5/31/2017; and 2. Status Conference set for 5/2/2017 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. (Court Reporter: none) (kld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
35 35 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/10 10:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Status Conference held on 1/10/2017. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2017 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. (Court Reporter: none) (kld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
34 34 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/30 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Status Conference held on 11/30/2016. 1. Discovery due by 2/1/2017; and 2. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. Counsel shall call AT&T Reservationless Conferencing at 888-363-4749, and Access Code 6743157#. (Court Reporter: none) (kld)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
33 33 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Fri 11/18 12:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 11/18/2016. Parties to contact the Court by 11/30/2016. (plp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 10/26 2:29 PM
ORDER the previously scheduled Status conference set for 11/16/2016 at 9:30 AM is hereby RESCHEDULED for 11/30/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/26/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/18 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/18/2016 at 11:00 AM, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto, Penn Traffic Building, 319 Washington Street, Room 206, Johnstown, PA. This is a text-only entry, no PDF document will issue. (plp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
31 31 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 09/22 12:56 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 9/22/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
30 30 order Order Order Granting Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/08 1:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/8/16. (njt) Modified on 9/8/2016. (njt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
29 29 order Case Management Order Thu 09/01 3:56 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Compliance with provisions of Rule 16 shall be completed as follows: Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be made by September 30, 2016. Amendments to the pleadings and joinder of additional parties will be completed by September 30, 2016. The ADR process will be completed no later than November 1, 2016. The parties shall complete fact discovery by February 1, 2017. A status/settlement conference will be held on February 3, 2017 at 10:00 AM Trial counsel shall attend and the parties shall be available by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/31/2016. (jmb)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 09/01 3:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: An Initial Case Management Conference was held on 9/1/2016. Counsel would like this case to be consolidated for discovery only with civil action number 16-290. They also request that the same judge handle both cases. Counsel also reported that Judge Pesto was asked whether he would be willing to conduct the ENE and he has agreed. The ENEs in both cases will take place together. An Initial Scheduling Order will be entered. Fallowing the conference the Court spoke with Judge Mitchell. This case will be transferred to him for further handling. (Court Reporter: none) (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 08/29 1:51 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2016
26 26 order Order Fri 08/26 11:45 AM
ORDER directing counsel to be prepared to discuss Hvizdak v. Torrance State Hosp., No. 2:16-cv-290, at the Initial Case Management Conference on 8/31/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 8/26/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (clh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
25 25 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 08/25 10:16 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 08/25 10:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Scheduling Order
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
23 23 misc Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/24 1:30 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2016
22 22 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/19 2:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT the (ECF No.11 ) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. An Amended Complaint (ECF No.21 ) was filed on August 18, 2016, rendering this motion moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/19/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2016
21 21 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/18 11:31 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL, filed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2016
20 20 2 pgs minutes Motion Hearing Mon 08/01 4:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: Oral Argument was held on 8/1/2016. The court held oral argument on defendants' partial motion to dismiss filed at ECF No.11 . Counsel for plaintiff advised that he misunderstood the motion and responded only to the argument that the entire complaint should be dismissed. Counsel agreed to withdraw all claimsfor emotional distress from the complaint. He advised that he may want to continue the claim against Mr. Snyder in his official capacity and proposed a legal methodology for doing so. The court explained that a suit against Snyder in his official capacity was the same as suing Torrance State Hospital. It was concluded that plaintiff would file an Amended Complaint no later than August 22, 2016. An initial case management conference will be scheduled for late August. Once the Amended Complaint is filed the Motion to Dismiss will be denied as moot. Defendants can determine whether a 2nd Motion to Dismiss is warranted after the Amended Complaint is filed. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jmb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/01 3:13 PM
ORDER that the initial scheduling conference will be held on August 31, 2016, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 7B, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse Building, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Trial counsel shall attend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a Rule 26(f) Report no later than two days before the scheduled conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process no later than two days before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/1/2016. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ADR Form
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
18 18 7 pgs respm Reply Brief Wed 07/13 9:46 AM
REPLY BRIEF to11 Motion to Dismiss filed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (Kaharick, Jerome) Modified on 7/14/2016 to add document linkage. (ept)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion Wed 07/13 9:44 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/12 8:29 AM
ORDER GRANTING the15 Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. The Oral Argument previously set for July 26, 2016 is rescheduled for August 1, 2016 at 2:00 PM. The Argument will be held before Judge Lisa Lenihan in Courtroom 7B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/12/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/12 8:31 AM
Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7B before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Mon 07/11 2:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Reschedule Oral Argument re 13 Response/Briefing Schedule,,, Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, by BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/05 11:22 AM
Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer presiding in case. (sms)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/05 11:23 AM
Judge David S. Cercone presiding and Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan referred. (sms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
14 14 misc District Judge Option Thu 06/30 11:24 AM
DISTRICT JUDGE OPTION by CHAMINE PHILLIPS to have this case randomly assigned to a U.S. District Judge. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2016
13 13 order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 06/24 12:16 PM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Plaintiff's Response and/or Brief in Opposition to Motion due by 7/14/2016. Defendants' Reply, if any, due by 7/21/2016. Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss set for 7/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 6/24/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (clh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
12 12 5 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 06/23 3:25 PM
BRIEF in Support re11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/23 3:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 05/24 1:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING the8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs Complaint is due on or before June 23, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 05/24/2016. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2016
9 9 misc Errata Mon 05/23 2:24 PM
Errata re8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. Reason for Correction: Incorrect Document Attached. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/23 2:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS by BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 22, 2016
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/22 12:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL waiver sent on 3/22/2016, answer due 5/23/2016. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/22 12:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. BRAD SNYDER waiver sent on 3/22/2016, answer due 5/23/2016. (Kaharick, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
5 5 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/18 8:26 AM
ORDER that counsel for Plaintiff shall either file a Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate or a District Judge Option no later than April 25, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 04/18/2016. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
4 4 misc Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 04/15 12:54 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/15 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yana L. Warshafsky on behalf of BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Warshafsky, Yana)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/15 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL. (Bradley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 03/11 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-3891404), filed by CHAMINE PHILLIPS. (ept)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Verification,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
service Summons Issued Fri 03/11 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to *BRAD SNYDER, TORRANCE STATE HOSPITAL.* (ept)
Related: [-]