Texas Western District Court
Judge:Lee Yeakel
Case #: 1:16-cv-00374
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2016
Terminated:Aug 16, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2016 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Defendant
HomeAway, Inc.
1011 West 5th Street, Suite 300
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Stephen E. McConnico
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Michael Merriman
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
David Dean Shank
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ivan Arnold
Represented By
Michael A. Bowse
Browne George Ross LLP
contact info
Daniel H. Byrne
Fritz, Byrne, Head & Fitzpatrick, PLLC
contact info
Keith J. Wesley
Browne George Ross LLP
contact info


1. Lawsuit filed against HomeAway over new fees (mystatesman.com)
Submitted Wed 03/23/2016
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, August 16, 2018
62 62 order Judgment Thu 08/16 1:32 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER REMAND. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
Related: [-]