USA v. Falyali et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:16-cr-00068 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 07, 2017 4:03 AM EST |
Defendant
Ozgur Demir (3)
|
|
Defendant
Halil Falyali (1)
|
|
Defendant
Husnu Falyali (2)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/06/2018 6:24 AM EST |
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |